De Arment v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Sophia Claire De Arment
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv02112
Filed: July 30, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/4/14. Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (lgale)
October 27, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/11/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 9/18/2015 11:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three (3) day Jury Trial set 10/5/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/27/14. (rebsec)
January 5, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/5/15. Unopposed Motion to Amend Civil Scheduling Order [#37] is GRANTED. (lgale, )
March 4, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/4/15. Joint Motion to Amend Civil Scheduling Order # 44 is GRANTED. Discovery due by 5/13/2015. (lgale, )
March 16, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff filed an 42 Amended Complaint asserting claims under Washington law instead of Colorado law. Aetna's 12 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot and the 36 Recommendation of United States Magistrate is terminated on the docket of the court. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/16/2015. (alowe)
April 6, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The 48 Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/6/2015.(alowe)
April 6, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ***Please Disregard; filed in the wrong case*** SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: 7-Day Jury Trial set for 5/16/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/29/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/6/2015. (alowe) Modified on 4/6/2015 (alowe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Arment v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Claire De Arment
Represented By: W. Randolph Barnhart
Represented By: Melissa A. Hailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura M. Sturges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.