Schaden v. Avenue Capital Management II, L.P. et al

Defendant: Fortress Investment Group, LLC and Avenue Capital Management II, L.P.
Plaintiff: Richard F. Schaden
 
Case Number: 1:2014cv02119
Filed: July 30, 2014
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Unopposed Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Motion to Consolidate with Related Case. All proceedings in this case are stayed until earlier of either forty-five (45) days from the date of this motion is filed or ten (10) days after the parties receive the court's ruling in Case No. 14-cv-02031-PAB-KLM on the Unopposed Motion to Consolidate. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/19/2014.(alowe)
October 7, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action Nos. 14-cv-02031-PAB-KLM and 14-cv-02119-REB-MJW shall be consolidated for all purposes. All future pleadings and other filings shall be filed in lead case 1:14-cv-02031-PAB only. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/7/2014.(alowe)
July 31, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Pilot Program Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/31/2014. Consent Form due on or before 9/11/2014. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/25/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (slibi, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Schaden v. Avenue Capital Management II, L.P. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortress Investment Group, LLC
Represented By: James T. Markus
Represented By: Steven R. Rider
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avenue Capital Management II, L.P.
Represented By: Stephen M. Baldini
Represented By: Jeffery A. Dailey
Represented By: Steven R. Rider
Represented By: Daniel F. Wake
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard F. Schaden
Represented By: Richard Francis Schaden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]