Rolfe v. Lawrence Memorial Hosp

Plaintiff: Tracy Rolfe
Defendant: Lawrence Memorial Hosp
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00080
Filed: January 19, 2010
 
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New London
Presiding Judge: Robert N. Chatigny
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2011 42 Featured Case Settlement Conference Order & Calendar: See attached. A Settlement Conference is scheduled for 5/3/2011 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. (Constantine, A.)
September 7, 2011 50 Featured Case ORDER : A settlement conference is scheduled for 10/11/2011 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. See attached order. (Constantine, A.)
September 13, 2011 51 Featured Case ORDER re: settlement conference. (Constantine, A.)
September 30, 2013 84 Featured Case ORDER granting 69 Motion for Summary Judgment for failure to raise a genuine issue of material fact to support the federal retaliation claim and because the Court accordingly declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 09/30/2013. (Bialek, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rolfe v. Lawrence Memorial Hosp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Rolfe
Represented By: Peter D. Goselin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Memorial Hosp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]