Wanamaker v. Westport Board of Education et al

Plaintiff: Sally J. Wanamaker
Defendant: Westport Board of Education and Elliot Landon
Case Number: 3:2011cv01791
Filed: November 16, 2011
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2015 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. As set forth herein, the Court DENIES 110 Motion in Limine. To the extent, however, that Plaintiff seeks to offer the responses to the Superintendent's letters and to the extent Defendant's motion seeks to preclude such responses, the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/16/15.(Bradley, K.)
September 25, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss. See attached memorandum of decision. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's ADA and CFEPA Section 46a-60(a)(1) claims without prejudice to leave to amend those claims within 30 days of this Order. The Court further dismisses Plaintiff's breach of contract claim with prejudice and dismisses the claims against Defendant Landon as barred by qualified immunity. The Clerk is therefore directed to terminate Defendant Landon as a defendant in this action. The rest of Plaintiff's claims remain extant for summary judgment and trial. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/25/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa)
July 16, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Supplemental Reply Brief 81 and granting in part and denying in part 83 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Reply Brief. Defendant may file that portion of its supplemental reply brief limited solely to the applicability of the Supreme Courts decision in the University of Texas case. Plaintiff shall have ten days to file a response limited to this single issue. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 7/16/2013. (Smith, M.)
July 22, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling, the Court denies 77 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 7/22/2013. (Smith, M.)
March 27, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 90 Recommended Ruling. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/27/2014. (Martella, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wanamaker v. Westport Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally J. Wanamaker
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westport Board of Education
Represented By: Robin B. Kallor
Represented By: Michael J. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Landon
Represented By: Robin B. Kallor
Represented By: Michael J. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.