Johnson et al v. Avalonbay Communities Inc et al

Plaintiff: Bryce Johnson and Eva Johnson
Defendant: Avalonbay Communities Inc and Gates Financing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv01032
Filed: July 16, 2012
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Robert N. Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 plaintiffs' motion to compel as to interrogatories 3 and 4 and request for production 6. See attached ruling. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 4/26/13. (Constantine, A.)
October 31, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & CALENDAR: A settlement conference is scheduled for 2/7/2014 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. See attached order for important instructions.(Constantine, A.)
December 17, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : At the request of defense counsel and with the consent of plaintiff's counsel, the settlement conference is rescheduled to 2/12/2014 at 11:00 AM and will conclude no later than 4:00 pm. The conference will be held in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT. Please see attached order for important instructions. (Constantine, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Avalonbay Communities Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Johnson
Represented By: Joseph Arthur Kubic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Johnson
Represented By: Joseph Arthur Kubic
Represented By: Joseph Arthur Kubic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalonbay Communities Inc
Represented By: Nicole C. Chomiak
Represented By: Stacey L. Pitcher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gates Financing, LLC
Represented By: Nicole C. Chomiak
Represented By: Stacey L. Pitcher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]