Kaye et al v. Amicus Mediation & Arbitration Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Roger H. Kaye, MD PC and Roger H. Kaye
Defendant: Amicus Mediation & Arbitration Group, Inc. and Hillary Earle
Case Number: 3:2013cv00347
Filed: March 14, 2013
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Janet C. Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying re 90 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Amicus Mediation & Arbitration Group, Inc., Hillary Earle, denying 92 MOTION to Stay filed by Amicus Mediation & Arbitration Group, Inc., Hillary Earle. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/10/2014. (Malone, P.)
October 29, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 115 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/29/2014. (Malone, P.) Modified on 10/30/2014 to mark as opinion.(Malone, P.).
May 27, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 58 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 60 Motion to Certify Class Class A and subclasses of Classes B and C are hereby CERTIFIED as defined in ruling. Lead plaintiffs Roger H. Kaye and Roger H. Kaye, MC PC are hereby APPOINTED as class representives of each class. Plaintiffs' counsel Attorneys Aytan Y. Bellin and Roger Furman are hereby APPOINTED as class counsel for each of the three classes.. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/27/2014. (Malone, P.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2014: # 1 Replacement PDF) (Lewis, D).
May 28, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED RULING denying 58 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 60 Motion to Certify Class Class A and subclasses of Classes B and C are hereby CERTIFIED as defined in ruling. Lead plaintiffs Roger H. Kaye and Roger H. Kaye, MC PC are hereby APPOINTED as class representives of each class. Plaintiffs' counsel Attorneys Aytan Y. Bellin and Roger Furman are hereby APPOINTED as class counsel for each of the three classes. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/28/2014.(Malone, P.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaye et al v. Amicus Mediation & Arbitration Group, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger H. Kaye, MD PC
Represented By: Aytan Y. Bellin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger H. Kaye
Represented By: Aytan Y. Bellin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amicus Mediation & Arbitration Group, Inc.
Represented By: Geraldine A. Cheverko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillary Earle
Represented By: Geraldine A. Cheverko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]