Knight, et al v. Longshoremen, et al

 
Case Number: 1:2001cv00005
Filed: January 3, 2001
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:0401 Labor Management Disclosure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2009 154 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 138 Motion For Summary Judgment, and 145 Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment (and other relief). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/30/2009. (nms)
July 14, 2010 185 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re findings of fact and conclusions of law on the issues of liability and damages. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/14/2010. (nms)
March 29, 2012 222 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 191 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Eddie Knight is GRANTED; the Clerk of Court is diretced to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs in the amount of $295,971.87; 187 MOTION for Relief from Judgment filed by E ddie Knight is DENIED; and 189 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Eddie Knight is GRANTED; the Court's Final Judgment Order of 7/14/10 (D.I. 186) is hereby amended to reflect an award of judgment in favor of Plaintiffs in the amount of $1884; the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/29/12. (ntl)
September 27, 2013 243 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER AND JUDGMENT re 235 MOTION Relief from Judgment is DENIED; 237 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief is GRANTED; 230 MOTION for Order Requiring Surety or ILA to continue its current supersedeas bond is DENIED as moo t; JUDGMENT in favor of Charles Miller-Bey, Eddie Knight, Eddie McBride, Leonard Riley, Jr. and against International Longshoremen's Association for attorneys' fees and costs in the total amount of $251,029.82 plus post-judgment interest. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/27/13. (ntl)
October 23, 2013 249 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 245 MOTION for Reargument is DENIED; Plaintiffs' request for an additional $24,137 in attorney's fees is DENIED; the Court will enter final judgment in favor of Plaintiffs in the amount of $243,758.34. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/23/13. (ntl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Knight, et al v. Longshoremen, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]