In Re: Pharmastem Therapeutics, Inc. Featured Case

 
Case Number: 1:2005md01660
Filed: February 17, 2005
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
 
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2009 38 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 37 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Pharmastem Therapeutics Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/7/2009. (asw)
December 4, 2009 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pharmastem Therapeutics Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
December 4, 2009 36 Letter to THE HONORABLE GREGORY M. SLEET from PHILIP A. ROVNER, ESQ. regarding STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL - re 35 Order. (Rovner, Philip)
November 30, 2009 35 Featured Case ORDER for status report. Status report, or stipulation of dismissal due 12/14/09. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/30/09. (mmm)
April 13, 2009 Featured Case ORAL ORDER CANCELLING STATUS TELECCONFERNCE: The status teleconference scheduled for today, April 13, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. HAS BEEN REMOVED from the court's calendar. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/13/2009. (asw)
April 7, 2009 Featured Case ORAL ORDER RESCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE: The status teleconference currently scheduled for Tuesday, April 14, 2009, at 1:00 p.m. with the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED to Monday, April 13, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/7/2009. (ctd)
March 27, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Status Telephone Conference held on 3/27/2009. Discussion on the status of the case. The court will hold another Status Teleconference on 4/14/2009 at 1:00 PM. (Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer.) (asw)
February 26, 2009 Featured Case ORAL ORDER SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE: A status teleconference has been scheduled for Friday, March 27, 2009, at 11:00 a.m. with the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Counsel for ViaCell, Inc. is directed to initiate the conference call and call chambers at (302) 573-6470 once all the parties are on the line. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/26/2009. (ctd)
February 26, 2009 Featured Case ORAL ORDER CANCELLING STATUS TELECCONFERNCE: The status teleconference scheduled for Thursday, February 26, 2009, at 11:00 a.m. HAS BEEN REMOVED from the court's calendar (See D.I. 34). The teleconference will be rescheduled. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/26/2009. (ctd)
February 25, 2009 34 Letter to The Hon. Gregory M. Sleet from Jeffrey L. Moyer regarding request to reschedule status conference call - re Telephone Conference,. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
January 15, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Telephone Conference Re: Status held on 1/15/2009. Discussion on the status of the case. The court will hold another Status Teleconference on 2/26/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) (asw)
January 13, 2009 Featured Case ORAL ORDER RESCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE: The status teleconference scheduled for Tuesday, January 13, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. with the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED to Thursday, January 15, 2009, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for ViaCell, Inc. is directed to initiate the conference call and call chambers at (302) 573-6470 once all the parties are on the line. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/13/2009. (ctd)
November 25, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Telephone Conference Re: Status held on 11/25/2008. Discussion on the status of the case. The court shall set another Status Teleconference for 1/13/2009 at 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) (asw)
November 19, 2008 Featured Case ORAL ORDER RESCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE: The status teleconference currently scheduled for Thursday, November 20, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. with the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED to Tuesday, November 25, 2008, at 11:15 a.m. Counsel for ViaCell, Inc. is directed to initiate the conference call and call chambers at (302) 573-6470 once all the parties are on the line. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/19/2008. (ctd)
November 17, 2008 Featured Case ORAL ORDER SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE: A status teleconference has been scheduled for Thursday, November 20, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. with the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Counsel for ViaCell, Inc. is directed to initiate the conference call and call chambers at (302) 573-6470 once all the parties are on the line. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/17/2008. (ctd)
November 7, 2008 33 Letter to The Hon. Gregory M. Sleet from Jeffrey L. Moyer regarding status of case - re 32 Letter, 27 Order Staying Case,. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2008 32 Letter to Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Jeffrey L. Moyer regarding Supreme Court's decision re: petition for writ of certiorari - re 27 Order Staying Case,. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2007 31 Letter to The Hon. Gregory M. Sleet from Jeffrey L. Moyer regarding US Patent and Trademark Office ordering reexamination of PharmStem's patents - re 27 Order Staying Case,. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2007 30 Letter to The Hon. Gregory M. Sleet from Jeffrey L. Moyer regarding notifying Court of US Court of Appeals decision - re 27 Order Staying Case,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - US Ct. of Appeals decision)(Moyer, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2007 29 Letter to The. Hon. Gregory M. Sleet from Jeffrey L. Moyer regarding PTO issuing reexamination decisions regarding PharmaStem's patents - re 27 Order Staying Case,. (Moyer, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2007 28 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Viacell Inc: Entry of appearance of attorney Jameson A.L. Tweedie. Attorney Alyssa M. Schwartz terminated. (Tweedie, Jameson)
October 6, 2005 27 Featured Case ORDER STAYING all discovery pending decisions by the Federal Circuit and the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. The parties will notify the court when the Federal Circuit issues its ruling, and will notify the court when the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office issues its reexamination decision. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 10/6/05. (mmm)
October 4, 2005 26 NOTICE of Continuance of Initial Conference. The Initial Conference scheduled for Monday, October 6, 2005, is hereby continued to a date to be determined. (mmm)
September 29, 2005 25 PROPOSED ORDER Joint Proposed Case Management Plan and Agenda for Initial Pretrial Conference re 21 Order by Pharmastem Therapeutics Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
September 29, 2005 24 RESPONSE to Order re 21 Order PharmaStem's Initial Pretrial Conference Brief filed by Pharmastem Therapeutics Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
September 29, 2005 23 RESPONSE to Order re 21 Order by Defendants filed by Eunice U. Lee, Rajasree T. Seshadri, Sutter Health Inc., Carla Wells, Anita York, CorCell, Inc., Carlo M. Croce, Cryo-Cell International Inc., Molly McBride, Bruce Zafran, Caritas St. Elizabeth's Medical Center of Boston Inc., Fempartners Inc., Obstetrical & Gynecological Associates P.A., Viacell Inc, Monica Aszlerbaum, Andrew Cassidenti, Cord Blood Registry Inc, Arthur Goldstein, Bruce A. Hagadorn. (Schwartz, Alyssa)
August 8, 2005 22 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by CorCell, Inc., Carlo M. Croce, Cryo-Cell International Inc., Molly McBride, Bruce Zafran (Hughes, Peter)
July 19, 2005 21 Featured Case PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER and Order Scheduling Initial Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/19/05. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A #(2) Schedule B)(mmm)
June 24, 2005 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 71 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul J. Andre, Lisa Kobialka, Radhika Tandon filed by Pharmastem Therapeutics Inc., 46 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul J. Andre, Lisa Kobialka, Radhika Tandon filed by Pharmastem Therapeutics Inc., Nicholas Didier, 142 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul J. Andre, Lisa Kobialka, Radhika Tandon filed by Pharmastem Therapeutics Inc., Nicholas Didier, 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul J. Andre, Lisa Kobialka, Radhika Tandon filed by Pharmastem Therapeutics Inc., Nicholas Didier, 62 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul J. Andre, Lisa Kobialka, Radhika Tandon filed by Pharmastem Therapeutics Inc . Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/24/05. (asw )
June 22, 2005 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul J. Andre, Lisa Kobialka, Radhika Tandon - filed by Pharmastem Therapeutics Inc., Nicholas Didier. (Rovner, Philip)
June 21, 2005 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul F. Ware, Jr., P.C., John C. Englander, Christopher T. Holding, Nicholas K. Motrokostas and Elaine Herrmann Blais filed by Viacell Inc . Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/21/05. (asw )
June 17, 2005 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A. Rovner on behalf of Pharmastem Therapeutics Inc., Nicholas Didier (Rovner, Philip)
June 17, 2005 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa M. Schwartz on behalf of Viacell Inc (Schwartz, Alyssa)
June 17, 2005 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Moyer on behalf of Viacell Inc (Moyer, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2005 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul F. Ware, Jr., P.C., John C. Englander, Christopher T. Holding, Nicholas K. Motrokostas and Elaine Herrmann Blais - filed by Viacell Inc. (Schwartz, Alyssa)
May 19, 2005 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Samuel Brooks Shepherd terminated . Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/19/05. (mmm)
May 12, 2005 Receipt of original records from Central District of California 8:04-cv-921-GLT-AN. USDC/DE civil action number 05-152 GMS. (mwm, )
May 6, 2005 Receipt of original records from District of Massachusetts (04-cv-11673-RWZ). District Court of Delaware's case number 05cv155 GMS. (mwm, )
April 26, 2005 14 MOTION for Scheduling Order to be Vacated - filed by Monica Aszlerbaum. (Kirk, Richard)
April 26, 2005 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Kirk on behalf of Cord Blood Registry Inc (Kirk, Richard)
April 19, 2005 12 First MOTION for Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP to Withdraw as Attorney - filed by Archibald A. Grabinski, Stembanc Inc.. (Shepherd, Samuel)
April 13, 2005 11 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to counsel re 6 First MOTION for Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP to Withdraw as Attorney. (mmm)
March 31, 2005 Receipt of original records from Northern District of California; 3:04-cv-3072-JSW. USDC/DE case number 05cv153 GMS (mwm, )
March 28, 2005 Receipt of original records from Eastern District of Pennsylvania 2:04-cv-3561-RK. Civil Action No. 05cv156 GMS (mwm, )
March 25, 2005 Receipt of original records from Middle District of Florida 8:04-cv-1740 (USDC/DE civil action number 05cv154 GMS) (mwm, )
March 25, 2005 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP's Opening Brief in Support of its Motion to Withdraw; Declaration of Samuel B. Shepherd in Support of Quinn Emanuel Urquart Oliver & Hedges, LLP's Motion to Withdraw; Declaration of Kimberly L. Busch in Support of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP's Motion to Withdraw served on PharmaStem Therapeutics, Inc.; Nicholas Didier; Sutter Health Inc.; Andrew Cassidenti; Anita York; Arthur Goldstein; Bruce A. Hagadorn; Carla Wells; Eunice U. Lee; Monica Aszlerbaum; Rajasree T. Seshadri; Cord Blood Registry Inc.; Viacell Inc.; CorCell, Inc.; Cryo-Cell International Inc.; Bruce Zafran, M.D.; Carlo M. Croce, M.D.; Molly McBride, M.D.; Caritas St. Elizabeth's Medical Center of Boston Inc.; Fempartners Inc.; Obstetrical & Gynecological Associates P.A.; Viacell Inc. on March 24, 2005, filed by Archibald A. Grabinski, Stembanc Inc.. (Shepherd, Samuel)
March 24, 2005 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP's Opening Brief in Support of its Motion to Withdraw; Declaration of Samuel B. Shepherd in Support of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP's Motion to Withdraw; Declaration of Kimberly L. Busch in Support of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP's Motion to Withdraw served on Archibald Grabinsky and Stembanc, Inc. on March 24, 2005, filed by Archibald A. Grabinski, Stembanc Inc.. (Shepherd, Samuel)
March 24, 2005 8 DECLARATION re 6 First MOTION for Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP to Withdraw as Attorney of Kimberly L. Busch by Archibald A. Grabinski, Stembanc Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Shepherd, Samuel)
March 24, 2005 7 DECLARATION re 6 First MOTION for Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP to Withdraw as Attorney of Samuel B. Shepherd by Archibald A. Grabinski, Stembanc Inc.. (Shepherd, Samuel)
March 24, 2005 6 First MOTION for Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP to Withdraw as Attorney - filed by Archibald A. Grabinski, Stembanc Inc.. (Shepherd, Samuel)
March 24, 2005 5 Letter to counsel from Marie McDavid, Case Manager, regarding advising counsel of transfer of cases to MDL 05-1660 GMS. With attachments: mailing list and ECF registration form. (c/m to counsel and Michael J. Beck, Clerk of MDL Judicial Panel). (mmm)
March 15, 2005 4 Letters from Clerk, USDC, DE to Clerks of 5 transferor Courts, requesting the original files and certified copies of the docket sheets. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Clerk of (ND/CA)# 2 Letter to Clerk of (MD/FL)# 3 Letter to Clerk of (D/MA)# 4 Letter to Clerk of (ED/PA))(mwm, )
February 17, 2005 CA No. 04-1335 GMS in the District of Delaware is included in this MDL (mwm, )
February 17, 2005 3 Letter to Clerk from MDL Panel regarding transfer of PharmaStem Therapeutics cases to Delaware.(mwm, ) Modified on 3/18/2005 (rjb, ).
February 17, 2005 2 Letter to Judge Sleet from MDL Panel regarding transfer of PharmaStem Therapeutics cases to Delaware. (mwm, )
February 17, 2005 1 TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the following actions to the District of Delaware: CA 04-921 (CD/CA), 04-3072 (ND/CA), 04-1740 (MD/FL), 04-11673 (DC/MA), 04-3561 (ED/PA); copies to: Clerks of District Courts (mwm, )
February 17, 2005 REFERENCE MUST BE MADE TO THE INDIVIDUAL DOCKET SHEET FOR ENTRIES RELATING ONLY TO INDIVIDUAL ACTIONS (mwm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In Re: Pharmastem Therapeutics, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]