ZF Meritor LLC et al v. Eaton Corporation

Case Number: 1:2006cv00623
Filed: October 5, 2006
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2009 144 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/20/2009. (lid)
September 14, 2009 169 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding evidentiary disputes. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/14/2009. (nmf)
March 10, 2011 259 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/10/11. (fms)
August 4, 2011 279 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/4/2011. (nmf)
December 20, 2013 337 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/20/2013. (nmfn)
June 5, 2014 373 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/5/2014. (nmfn)
June 18, 2014 386 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/18/2014. (fms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZF Meritor LLC et al v. Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.