Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. v. Braintree Laboratories Inc.

Plaintiff: Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.
Defendant: Braintree Laboratories Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv00142
Filed: March 12, 2007
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER OPINION on discovery issue. Signed by Special Master B. Wilson Refearn on 6/15/11. (fms)
July 7, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/7/2011. (nmf)
May 19, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/18/2010. (lid)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc. v. Braintree Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochester Drug Co-Operative Inc.
Represented By: David F. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Braintree Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.