Burtch v. Milberg Factors Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Burtch
Defendant: Milberg Factors Inc., Capital Factors Inc., CIT Group/Commercial Services Inc., GMAC Commercial Finance LLC, HSBC Business Credit (USA) Inc., Rosenthal & Rosenthal Inc., Sterling Factors Corporation and Wells Fargo Century Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv00556
Filed: September 17, 2007
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Presiding Judge: Vacant Judgeship
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 87 MOTION to Amend Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) and 15(a). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 6/4/2010. (nms)
July 15, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 87 MOTION to Amend Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) and 15(a). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 7/15/2010. (nms)
March 30, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT re 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rosenthal & Rosenthal Inc., TO GRANT re 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Joinder in and to (I) The CIT Group/Commercial Servi ces, Inc.'s Motion to Dimiss the Complaint and (II) the Motion of GMAC Commercial Finance LLC, Sterling Factors Corporation and Wells Fargo MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Joinder in and to (I) The CIT Group/Commercial Serv ices, Inc.'s Motion to Dimiss the Complaint and (II) the Motion of GMAC Commercial Finance LLC, Sterling Factors Corporation and Wells Fargo filed by Milberg Factors Inc., TO GRANT re 38 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Capi tal Factors Inc., TO DENY AS MOOTre 70 MOTION to Vacate Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate the February 6, 2008 Scheduling Order filed by Jeffrey L. Burtch, TO DENY re 73 MOTION to Strike 72 Reply Brief Certain Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of His Motion to Vacate the February 6, 2008 Scheduling Order MOTION to Strike 72 Reply Brief Certain Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of His Motion t o Vacate the February 6, 2008 Scheduling Order filed by Sterling Factors Corporation, Wells Fargo Century Inc., GMAC Commercial Finance LLC, TO DISMISS 1 Complaint, filed by Jeffrey L. Burtch, TO GRANT 62 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief filed by Jeffrey L. Burtch, TO GRANT re 37 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon and Joinder of Defendant HSBC Business Credit (USA) Inc. in Motions to Dismiss Filed by (I) CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. and (II) GMAC Commercial Finance LLC, Sterling Factors Corporation, and Wells Fargo Century, I MOTION to Dismiss Based upon and Joinder of Defendant HSBC Business Credit (USA) Inc. in Motions to Dismiss Filed by (I) CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. and (II) GMAC Commercial Finance LL C, Sterling Factors Corporation, and Wells Fargo Century, I filed by HSBC Business Credit (USA) Inc., TO GRANT re 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CIT Group/Commercial Services Inc., TO GRANT 29 MOTION to Dismiss Based u pon Motion Of Defendants GMAC Commercial Finance LLC, Sterling Factors Corporation and Wells Fargo Century, Inc. For An Order Dismissing The Complaint filed by Sterling Factors Corporation, Wells Fargo Century Inc., GMAC Commercial Finance LLC. Objections to R&R due by 4/17/2009. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/30/2009. (rpg)
May 31, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 76 Objections to 75 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 5/31/2009. (nms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burtch v. Milberg Factors Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Burtch
Represented By: Robert W. Pedigo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milberg Factors Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Factors Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIT Group/Commercial Services Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Commercial Finance LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Business Credit (USA) Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosenthal & Rosenthal Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Factors Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Century Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]