Belden Technologies Inc. et al v. Superior Essex Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Belden Technologies Inc. and Belden CDT (Canada) Inc.
Defendant: Superior Essex Inc. and Superior Essex Communications LP
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00063
Filed: January 29, 2008
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2010 215 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re: claim construction. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/24/2010. (nmf)
August 24, 2010 216 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/24/2010. (nmf)
September 2, 2010 225 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying the oral motion for a stay. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/2/2010. (nmf)
August 12, 2011 310 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/12/2011. (nmf)
April 3, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re: discovery and granting 45 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (with Local Rule 7.1.1 certification). SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/3/2009. (nmf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Belden Technologies Inc. et al v. Superior Essex Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belden Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belden CDT (Canada) Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Essex Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Essex Communications LP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]