St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc. v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00804
Filed: October 26, 2009
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2012 62 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status teleconference has been scheduled for May 14, 2012 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4573. No further submissions are needed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/18/12. (ntl)
April 6, 2012 61 Joint STATUS REPORT by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (McGonigle, Patricia)
March 6, 2012 60 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Patricia P. McGonigle, Esquire regarding joint status report. (McGonigle, Patricia)
February 3, 2012 59 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Patricia P. McGonigle, Esquire regarding joint status report - re 48 Order,,. (McGonigle, Patricia)
January 6, 2012 58 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Patricia P. McGonigle, Esquire regarding Joint Status Report - re 48 Order,,. (McGonigle, Patricia)
December 7, 2011 57 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Patricia P. McGonigle regarding Joint Status Report - re 48 Order,,. (McGonigle, Patricia)
November 7, 2011 56 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Patricia P. McGonigle regarding Joint Status Report - re 48 Order,,. (McGonigle, Patricia)
October 6, 2011 55 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Patricia P. McGonigle, Esquire regarding Joint Status Report - re 48 Order,,. (McGonigle, Patricia)
September 14, 2011 54 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Apple Inc. (Lydon, Tiffany)
September 6, 2011 53 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Patricia P. McGonigle, Esquire regarding Joint Status Report - re 48 Order,,. (McGonigle, Patricia)
August 5, 2011 52 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Patricia P. McGonigle, Esquire regarding joint status report - re 48 Order,,. (McGonigle, Patricia)
July 8, 2011 51 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jared T. Green regarding Status Update. (Green, Jared)
June 27, 2011 50 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Apple Inc. (Hong, Caroline)
June 8, 2011 49 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jared T. Green, Esquire regarding Joint Status Report - re 48 Order,,. (Green, Jared)
May 9, 2011 48 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' recent submissions (D.I. 45 , 46 , 47 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Apple Inc.'s request to extend the current stay of this action is GRANTED. The Court agrees with Apple that the interests of the Court will best be served by extending the stay in this action until after the Court decides the motions for summary judgment of non-infringement in the related cases. Accordingly, this action is STAYED until further order of the Court. The parties shall provide the Court with a joint status report every thirty (30) days after the date of this Order. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/9/11. (ntl)
April 29, 2011 47 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Patricia P. McGonigle regarding enclosing proposed Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order - re 46 Proposed Order. (McGonigle, Patricia)
April 29, 2011 46 PROPOSED ORDER Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order re 12 Scheduling Order, by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (McGonigle, Patricia)
April 29, 2011 45 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding Apple's request for extension of stay. (Lydon, Tiffany)
April 29, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 44 Stipulation to extend time to file scheduling order filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc. ( Scheduling Order due 4/29/2011 ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/29/2011. (rpg)
April 28, 2011 44 STIPULATION extend time to file scheduling order by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (McGonigle, Patricia)
April 27, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Charles W Bradley and Glenn E. Forbis for St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc. added for electronic noticing. (nms)
April 18, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles W. Bradley, Esquire and Glenn E. Forbis, Esquire filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/18/11. (ntl)
April 14, 2011 43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles W. Bradley, Esquire and Glenn E. Forbis, Esquire - filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (McGonigle, Patricia)
April 4, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney R. Terrance Rader for St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.,R. Terrance Rader for St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.,R. Terrance Rader for St. Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc. added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00077-LPS, 1:04-cv-01436-LPS, 1:09-cv-00804-LPS(dmp, )
April 1, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. Terrance Rader, Esquire filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/1/11. (ntl)
April 1, 2011 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. Terrance Rader, Esquire - filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (McGonigle, Patricia)
April 1, 2011 41 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Ronald J. Schutz, Becky R. Thorson, Carrie M. Lambert, Annie Huang, Seth A. Northrop, Jake M. Holdreith, Trevor J. Foster and Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi, LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: withdrawing as counsel of record. (McGonigle, Patricia)
March 14, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 40 Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time to Submit Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/14/11. (ntl)
March 9, 2011 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order - filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (McGonigle, Patricia)
January 31, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 39 Stipulation and Order for Extension to Submit Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order to 3/11/11. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/31/11. (ntl)
January 27, 2011 39 STIPULATION for Extension to Submit Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (McGonigle, Patricia)
January 26, 2011 38 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John G. Day regarding case status - re 37 Letter. (Day, John)
January 25, 2011 37 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Patricia P. McGonigle, Esquire regarding status update to the Court - re 35 Stipulation. (McGonigle, Patricia)
January 25, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: Claim Construction Chart deleted and re-docketed in case number 09cv704-LPS per counsel's telephone request on 1/25/2011. (rpg)
October 28, 2010 36 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: the Markman Hearing scheduled for 3/31/11 is cancelled. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/28/10. (ntl)
August 17, 2010 Case reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (maw)
July 28, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 35 Stipulation filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/28/2010. (rpg)
July 28, 2010 35 STIPULATION to Stay Action by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (McGonigle, Patricia)
May 20, 2010 34 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 5/20/2010. (nms)
May 13, 2010 33 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding The Disclosure And Use Of Discovery Materials. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 5/13/2010. (nms)
May 13, 2010 32 Featured Case ORDER Entering the Proposed Protective Order Regarding the Disclosure And Use of Discovery Materials (see D.I. 28 , Ex. 2). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 5/13/2010. (nms)
May 11, 2010 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Documents and Things and Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories, filed by Apple Inc., 21 Notice of Service filed by Apple Inc..(Green, Jared) Modified on 5/12/2010 (nms).
May 3, 2010 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Apple Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany)
May 3, 2010 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Documents and Things by Apple Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany)
May 3, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Trevor J. Foster, Esquire of Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi, LLP filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 5/3/2010. (nms)
April 30, 2010 28 Letter to The Honorable Joseph J. Farnan from Jared T. Green, Esquire regarding Proposed Protective Order - re 25 Stipulation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Green, Jared)
April 30, 2010 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Trevor J. Foster, Esquire of Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi, LLP - filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (Green, Jared)
April 22, 2010 26 Featured Case ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation to extend time to file the Proposed Protective Order, filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc., Apple Inc.,(Set Deadlines: Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/30/2010). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/22/2010. (nms)
April 16, 2010 25 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time to Submit Proposed Protective Order by Apple Inc., St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (Day, John)
April 6, 2010 23 Featured Case ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation for Addendum to Rule 16 Scheduling Order, filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc., (Set Deadlines: Identification of fact witnesses and document production due by 9/30/2010)(see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/6/2010. (nms)
April 6, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Seth Kruglak filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 4/6/2010. (nms)
April 6, 2010 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Requests for Documents and Things by Apple Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany)
April 6, 2010 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories by Apple Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany)
March 25, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald J. Schutz, Esquire, Becky R. Thorson, Esquire, Carrie M. Lambert, Esquire, Annie Huang, Esquire, Jake M. Holdreith, Esquire, and Seth A. Northrop, Esquire filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/25/2010. (nms)
March 24, 2010 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald J. Schutz, Esquire, Becky R. Thorson, Esquire, Carrie M. Lambert, Esquire, Annie Huang, Esquire, Jake M. Holdreith, Esquire, and Seth A. Northrop, Esquire - filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (McGonigle, Patricia)
March 19, 2010 15 ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc. by Apple Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 3/22/2010 (nms).
March 19, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation to Modify Rule 16 Scheduling Order, filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.,(Set Deadline: The Parties will meet and confer regarding certain discovery issues by 3/30/2010)(see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/19/2010. (nms)
March 16, 2010 13 Joint STIPULATION that certain dates in the Rule 16 Scheduling Order entered on March 2, 2010 be modified re 12 Scheduling Order, by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (McGonigle, Patricia)
March 4, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. ( Notice is for Court administrative purposes only ). (rpg)
March 2, 2010 12 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge Stark for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 5/14/2010. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2010. Fact Discovery cut off due by 2/28/2011. Claims Construction Opening Briefs due by 2/10/2011. Claims Construction Answering Briefs due by 3/10/2011. Markman Hearing set for 3/31/2011 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/2/2010. (nms)
February 19, 2010 11 PROPOSED Rule 16 Scheduling Order, by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (McGonigle, Patricia) Modified on 2/22/2010 (nms).
February 12, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer first amended complaint to March 19, 2010, filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc., Apple Inc. (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 3/19/2010). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 2/12/2010. (nms)
February 12, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Henry B. Gutman, Jeffrey E. Ostrow, and Victor Cole filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 2/12/2010. (nms)
February 9, 2010 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Henry B. Gutman, Jeffrey E. Ostrow, and Victor Cole - filed by Apple Inc.. (Day, John)
February 8, 2010 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer first amended complaint to March 19, 2010 - filed by Apple Inc., St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (Day, John)
February 8, 2010 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Day on behalf of Apple Inc. (Day, John)
January 27, 2010 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Apple Inc.- filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(McGonigle, Patricia)
January 22, 2010 6 DECLARATION of Mailing as to service on Defendant Apple Inc via registered agent, by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(McGonigle, Patricia) Modified on 1/25/2010 (nms).
January 22, 2010 5 DECLARATION of Mailing as to service on Defendant Apple Inc., by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(McGonigle, Patricia) Modified on 1/25/2010 (nms).
January 20, 2010 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (1 Infinite Loop, Cupertino, CA 95014, and c/o Registered Agent, CT Corporation System, 818 West Seventh Street, Los Angeles, CA 90017) on 1/20/2010. (fms)
January 11, 2010 Featured Case ORAL ORDER GRANTING a 30-day extension of time for parties to submit a Proposed Rule 16 Scheduling Order.. ORDERED by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 1/11/2010. (dlk)
December 9, 2009 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for January 13, 2010 is CANCELLED. Counsel shall confer and submit a proposed form of order by January 13, 2009. ORDERED by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 12/9/2009. (dlk)
November 30, 2009 4 Featured Case ORDER, Setting Rule 16(b) Conference. A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/13/2010 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/30/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(nms)
November 4, 2009 Case assigned to Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.. Please include the initials of the Judge (JJF) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
October 26, 2009 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,138,459; 6,094,219; 6,233,010 B1; 6,323,899 B1; (mxw, )
October 26, 2009 No Summons Issued (mxw, )
October 26, 2009 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (mxw, )
October 26, 2009 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 03110000000000648911.) - filed by St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mxw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St Clair Intellectual Property Consultants Inc.
Represented By: Patricia Pyles McGonigle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]