State of Delaware Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al

Plaintiff: State of Delaware Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers, John McHugh, Jo-Ellen Darcy, Robert L. Van Antwerp, Jr. and Thomas Tickner
Case Number: 1:2009cv00821
Filed: October 30, 2009
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/16/2010. (lid)
January 27, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/27/2010. (nmf)
January 29, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/29/2010. (nmf)
July 15, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/15/2010. (nmf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Delaware Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control
Represented By: Jennifer Danella Oliva
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McHugh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo-Ellen Darcy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Van Antwerp, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Tickner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]