State of New York v. Intel Corporation Featured Case

Plaintiff: State of New York
Defendant: Intel Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00827
Filed: November 4, 2009
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2011 298 Featured Case ORDER CANCELLING Trial, Vacating Scheduling Order, and Staying Case. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/23/2012. (rpg)
December 23, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 12/23/2011. (Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan.) (rpg)
December 23, 2011 297 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Response to New York's Proposal to Dismiss its Claims, dated December 22, 2011 - re 296 Letter. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 22, 2011 296 Letter to Hon. Leonard Stark from Plaintiff State of NY regarding Proposal on Moving the Case Forward. (Zain, Saami)
December 22, 2011 295 SEALED DECLARATION re 293 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment, 294 Opening Brief in Support DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. FLOYD WITH EXHIBITS A-G by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 22, 2011 294 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re 293 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Intel Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2012. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 22, 2011 293 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 22, 2011 292 REDACTED VERSION of 278 Declaration of Brian C. Rocca by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-FF)(Horwitz, Richard)
December 22, 2011 291 REDACTED VERSION of 277 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark re Motion to Compel by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 19, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 286 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karla Sanchez filed by State of New York. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/19/11. (ntl)
December 19, 2011 290 Featured Case ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order: Plaintiff's draft of the Joint Pre-Trial Order shall be due on December 21, 2011. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/19/11. (ntl)
December 19, 2011 289 Featured Case ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: The Telephone Conference set for 12/23/2011 at 10:00 AM is hereby rescheduled to begin at 1:00 PM on 12/23/11. Defendant's counsel shall initiate the call to 302-573-4573. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/19/11. (ntl)
December 16, 2011 288 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Response to New York's Request to Push Back 12/19/11 date for New York's Pretrial Exchanges Until 12/29/11. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 16, 2011 287 Letter to Hon. Leonard Stark from Plaintiff State of NY regarding Modifying JPO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zain, Saami)
December 15, 2011 286 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karla Sanchez - filed by State of New York. (Zain, Saami)
December 15, 2011 285 REDACTED VERSION of 264 Declaration, DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. FLOYD IN SUPPORT OF INTEL CORPORATION'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. FREDERICK WARREN-BOLTON by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 15, 2011 284 Featured Case ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 12/23/2011 at 10:00 AM. Defendant's counsel shall initiate the call to 302-573-4573. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/15/11. (ntl)
December 15, 2011 283 REDACTED VERSION of 265 Reply Brief, REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. FREDERICK WARREN-BOULTON by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 15, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Teleconference held on 12/15/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
December 15, 2011 282 REDACTED VERSION of 266 Declaration DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. FLOYD IN SUPPORT OF INTEL CORPORATION'S COMBINED REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 15, 2011 281 REDACTED VERSION of 265 Reply Brief, INTEL CORPORATION'S COMBINED REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 14, 2011 280 Letter to SEALED letter to Court from Jeremy R. Kasha regarding in Opposition to Intel's Motion to Compel 30b6 Deposition of the OAG - re 277 Letter. (Kasha, Jeremy)
December 13, 2011 279 {REDACTED version of D.I. 280} Letter to Court from Jeremy R. Kasha regarding in Opposition to Intel's Motion to Compel 30b6 Deposition of the OAG - re 277 Letter. (Kasha, Jeremy) Modified on 12/14/2011 (ntl).
December 12, 2011 278 SEALED DECLARATION re 277 Letter DECLARATION OF BRIAN C. ROCCA WITH EXHIBITS A-Z by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 12, 2011 277 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 12, 2011 276 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Request for Brief Status Conference on December 15, 2011, at 11:30 a.m.. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 7, 2011 275 Featured Case ORDER granting re 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUE OF LIMITATIONS GROUNDS filed by Intel Corporation, 274 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/7/2011. (rpg)
December 7, 2011 274 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/7/2011. (rpg)
December 7, 2011 273 Featured Case ORDER granting 163 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 17(a), RULE 12(b)(1), RULE 12(b)(6), AND RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S CLAIMS ON BEHALF OF NON-STATE PUBLIC ENTITIES) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 17(a), RULE 12(b)(1), RULE 12(b)(6), AND RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S CLAIMS ON BEHALF OF NON-STATE PUBLIC ENTITIES) filed by Intel Corporation re 272 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/7/2011. (rpg)
December 7, 2011 272 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/7/2011. (rpg)
December 7, 2011 271 Featured Case ORDER granting 161 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S DONNELLY ACT DAMAGES CLAIM ON BEHALF OF CONSUMERS) re 270 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/7/2011. (rpg)
December 7, 2011 270 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/7/2011. (rpg)
December 5, 2011 269 Letter to Judge Stark from New York Atorney General, AAG Jeremy Kasha regarding Oral Argument - re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment DUE TO LACK OF ANTICOMPETITIVE EXCLUSION, ANTITRUST INJURY AND MEASURABLE DAMAGES, 237 MOTION INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR. FREDERICK WARREN-BOULTON, 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment Intel Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment Based On The Lawfulness Of Its Discounting Practices. (Kasha, Jeremy)
December 5, 2011 268 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Completed Briefing on Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 2, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 268 removed from docket (filed in wrong case). (ntl)
December 2, 2011 267 Featured Case ORDER Setting Teleconference : A Discovery Teleconference is set for 12/15/2011 at 11:30 AM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/2/11. (ntl)
November 30, 2011 266 SEALED DECLARATION re 265 Reply Brief, DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. FLOYD IN SUPPORT OF INTEL CORPORATION'S COMBINED REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
November 30, 2011 265 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment DUE TO LACK OF ANTICOMPETITIVE EXCLUSION, ANTITRUST INJURY AND MEASURABLE DAMAGES, 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment Intel Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment Based On The Lawfulness Of Its Discounting Practices INTEL CORPORATION'S COMBINED REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
November 30, 2011 264 SEALED DECLARATION re 263 Reply Brief DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. FLOYD IN SUPPORT OF INTEL CORPORATION'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. FREDERICK WARREN-BOLTON WITH EXHIBITS A-D by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
November 30, 2011 263 SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 237 MOTION INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR. FREDERICK WARREN-BOULTON filed by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
November 23, 2011 262 REDACTED VERSION of 254 Declaration, by State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Zain, Saami)
November 23, 2011 261 REDACTED VERSION of 253 Declaration, by State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Nos. 1 - 39)(Zain, Saami)
November 23, 2011 260 REDACTED VERSION of 252 Answering Brief in Opposition, (combined) Motion for Summary Jugdment Due to Lack of Anticompetitive Exclusion, Antitrust Injury, and Measureable Damages; Lawfulness of Discounting Practices by State of New York. (Zain, Saami)
November 23, 2011 259 REDACTED VERSION of 251 Declaration of Richard Schwartz, Esq. by State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Zain, Saami)
November 23, 2011 258 REDACTED VERSION of 250 Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Exclude The Testimony of Dr. Frederick Warren-Boulton by State of New York. (Zain, Saami)
November 22, 2011 257 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Additional Six Hours of Trial Time Per Side - re 70 Scheduling Order,,. (Horwitz, Richard)
November 21, 2011 256 Letter to Court from Plaintiff State of New York regarding Response to Intel letter re: Parens Patriae Claims - re 255 Letter. (Kasha, Jeremy)
November 21, 2011 255 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding parens patriae claim. (Horwitz, Richard)
November 14, 2011 254 SEALED DECLARATION re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment DUE TO LACK OF ANTICOMPETITIVE EXCLUSION, ANTITRUST INJURY AND MEASURABLE DAMAGES, 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment Intel Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment Based On The Lawfulness Of Its Discounting Practices Declaration of Don Greene by State of New York. (Kasha, Jeremy)
November 14, 2011 253 SEALED DECLARATION re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment DUE TO LACK OF ANTICOMPETITIVE EXCLUSION, ANTITRUST INJURY AND MEASURABLE DAMAGES, 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment Intel Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment Based On The Lawfulness Of Its Discounting Practices Declaration of Jeremy Kasha by State of New York. (Kasha, Jeremy)
November 14, 2011 252 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment DUE TO LACK OF ANTICOMPETITIVE EXCLUSION, ANTITRUST INJURY AND MEASURABLE DAMAGES, 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment Intel Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment Based On The Lawfulness Of Its Discounting Practices filed by State of New York.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/28/2011. (Kasha, Jeremy)
November 14, 2011 251 SEALED DECLARATION re 237 MOTION INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR. FREDERICK WARREN-BOULTON Decl. of Richard Schwartz by State of New York. (Kasha, Jeremy)
November 14, 2011 250 SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 237 MOTION INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR. FREDERICK WARREN-BOULTON filed by State of New York.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/28/2011. (Kasha, Jeremy)
November 14, 2011 249 OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument Hearing held on October 27, 2011 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter: Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/5/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2012. (bpg)
November 11, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 248 Unopposed motion to file overlength and combined briefs in response to pending motions filed by State of New York. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/11/11. (ntl)
November 10, 2011 248 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed motion to file overlength and combined briefs in response to pending motions - filed by State of New York. (Kasha, Jeremy)
November 7, 2011 247 Official Transcript of Hearing held on October 27, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2012. (bpg)
October 27, 2011 246 REDACTED VERSION of 238 Declaration of Frank M. Hinman by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A, Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A, Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A, Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A, Part 6, # 7 Exhibit A, Part 7, # 8 Exhibit B-D, Part 1, # 9 Exhibit B-D, Part 2, # 10 Exhibit B-D, Part 3, # 11 Exhibit B-D, Part 4, # 12 Exhibit B-D, Part 5, # 13 Exhibit B-D, Part 6, # 14 Exhibit B-D, Part 7, # 15 Exhibit B-D, Part 8, # 16 Exhibit B-D, Part 9)(Horwitz, Richard)
October 27, 2011 245 REDACTED VERSION of 239 MEMORANDUM in Support of its Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Frederick Warren-Boulton by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 27, 2011 244 REDACTED VERSION of 235 Declaration, of Daniel S. Floyd in Support of Intel Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Anticompetitive Exclusion, Antitrust Injury and Measurable Damages by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A, Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A, Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A, Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A, Part 6, # 7 Exhibit A, Part 7, # 8 Exhibit B-F, Part 1, # 9 Exhibit B-F, Part 2, # 10 Exhibit B-F, Part 3, # 11 Exhibit B-F, Part 4, # 12 Exhibit B-F, Part 5, # 13 Exhibit B-F, Part 6, # 14 Exhibit B-F, Part 7, # 15 Exhibit B-F, Part 8)(Horwitz, Richard)
October 27, 2011 243 REDACTED VERSION of 236 MEMORANDUM in Support, of its Motion for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Anticompetitive Exclusion, Antitrust Injury, and Measurable Damages by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 27, 2011 242 REDACTED VERSION of 233 Declaration, of Daniel S. Floyd in Support of Intel Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on the Lawfulness of its Discounting Practices by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A, Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A, Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A, Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A, Part 6, # 7 Exhibit A, Part 7, # 8 Exhibit B-F)(Horwitz, Richard)
October 27, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 10/27/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
October 27, 2011 241 REDACTED VERSION of 232 Opening Brief in Support, of its Motion for Summary Judgment Based on the Lawfulness of its Discounting Practices by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 24, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 240 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Responses & Replies for two Summary Judgment Motions and Daubert Motion to November 14, 2011 -- Set Briefing Schedule: re 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment Intel Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment Based On The Lawfulness Of Its Discounting Practices, 237 MOTION INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR. FREDERICK WARREN-BOULTON, 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment DUE TO LACK OF ANTICOMPETITIVE EXCLUSION, ANTITRUST INJURY AND MEASURABLE DAMAGES (Answering Briefs due 11/14/2011, Reply Briefs due 11/30/2011). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/24/11. (ntl)
October 20, 2011 240 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Responses & Replies for two Summary Judgment Motions and Daubert Motion to November 14, 2011 - filed by State of New York. (Kasha, Jeremy)
October 14, 2011 239 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re 237 MOTION INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR. FREDERICK WARREN-BOULTON filed by Intel Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2011. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 14, 2011 238 SEALED DECLARATION re 237 MOTION INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR. FREDERICK WARREN-BOULTON DECLARATION OF FRANK M. HINMAN WITH EXHIBITS A-D by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 14, 2011 237 MOTION INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DR. FREDERICK WARREN-BOULTON - filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horwitz, Richard)
October 14, 2011 236 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment DUE TO LACK OF ANTICOMPETITIVE EXCLUSION, ANTITRUST INJURY AND MEASURABLE DAMAGES filed by Intel Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2011. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 14, 2011 235 SEALED DECLARATION re 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment DUE TO LACK OF ANTICOMPETITIVE EXCLUSION, ANTITRUST INJURY AND MEASURABLE DAMAGES DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. FLOYD IN SUPPORT OF INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE TO LACK OF ANTICOMPETITIVE EXCLUSION, ANTITRUST INJURY AND MEASURABLE DAMAGES by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 14, 2011 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment DUE TO LACK OF ANTICOMPETITIVE EXCLUSION, ANTITRUST INJURY AND MEASURABLE DAMAGES - filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horwitz, Richard)
October 14, 2011 233 SEALED DECLARATION re 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment Intel Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment Based On The Lawfulness Of Its Discounting Practices Declaration of Daniel S. Floyd In Support of Intel Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment Based On The Lawfulness Of Its Discounting Practices, with Exhibits A through F (SEALED) by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 14, 2011 232 SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment Intel Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment Based On The Lawfulness Of Its Discounting Practices filed by Intel Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2011. (Horwitz, Richard)
October 14, 2011 231 MOTION for Summary Judgment Intel Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment Based On The Lawfulness Of Its Discounting Practices - filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order)(Horwitz, Richard)
September 29, 2011 230 Featured Case ORDER Setting Teleconference (Defense counsel to initiate the call): The teleconference set for 9/29/2011 at 4:00 PM with Judge Thynge to discuss ADR has been rescheduled to 1/10/2012 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/29/2011. (cak)
September 23, 2011 229 NOTICE of ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA AD TESTIFICANDUM (ISSUED TO FREDERICK R. WARREN-BOULTON) WITH EXHIBIT 1 AND PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED by Intel Corporation (Brady, Jennifer)
September 23, 2011 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Gimler Brady on behalf of All Defendants (Brady, Jennifer)
September 15, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert A. Van Nest for Intel Corporation added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
September 14, 2011 227 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (W. HARDING DRANE, JR.) by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
September 12, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 225 Stipulation and Order extending deadline for completion of expert depositions by 10/14/11. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/9/11. (ntl)
September 12, 2011 226 NOTICE OF SERVICE of EXPERT REPORT OF PROFESSOR KEVIN M. MURPHY; EXPERT REPORT OF ROBIN COOPER, DBA; AND EXPERT REPORT OF DR. GARY J. DORMAN by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
September 9, 2011 225 Joint STIPULATION Extend Deadline For Completion of Expert Depositions re 211 SO ORDERED, Set Deadlines, 209 Proposed Order STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF EXPERT DEPOSITIONS by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
September 8, 2011 224 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear argument on the pending motions on October 27, 2011 beginning at 2:00 p.m. Each side will be allocated up to 45 minutes to present its argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/8/11. (ntl)
August 25, 2011 223 REQUEST for Oral Argument by State of New York re 161 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S DONNELLY ACT DAMAGES CLAIM ON BEHALF OF CONSUMERS) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S DONNELLY ACT DAMAGES CLAIM ON BEHALF OF CONSUMERS), 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUE OF LIMITATIONS GROUNDS, 163 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 17(a), RULE 12(b)(1), RULE 12(b)(6), AND RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S CLAIMS ON BEHALF OF NON-STATE PUBLIC ENTITIES) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 17(a), RULE 12(b)(1), RULE 12(b)(6), AND RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S CLAIMS ON BEHALF OF NON-STATE PUBLIC ENTITIES). (Kasha, Jeremy)
August 19, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: docket text contained in d.i.'s 166 , 167 , 173 , 215 , 216 , 218 , and 222 updated per counsel's telephone request on 8/19/2011. (rpg)
August 19, 2011 222 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Intel Corporation re 161 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S DONNELLY ACT DAMAGES CLAIM ON BEHALF OF CONSUMERS) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S DONNELLY ACT DAMAGES CLAIM ON BEHALF OF CONSUMERS), 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS GROUNDS, 163 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 17(a), RULE 12(b)(1), RULE 12(b)(6), AND RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S CLAIMS ON BEHALF OF NON-STATE PUBLIC ENTITIES) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 17(a), RULE 12(b)(1), RULE 12(b)(6), AND RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S CLAIMS ON BEHALF OF NON-STATE PUBLIC ENTITIES). (Drane, W.) Modified on 8/19/2011 (rpg).
August 19, 2011 221 Official Transcript of Telephone Confererence held on July 14, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/9/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2011. (bpg)
August 17, 2011 220 REPLY BRIEF re 161 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S DONNELLY ACT DAMAGES CLAIM ON BEHALF OF CONSUMERS) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S DONNELLY ACT DAMAGES CLAIM ON BEHALF OF CONSUMERS) filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Drane, W.)
August 17, 2011 219 REPLY BRIEF re 163 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 17(a), RULE 12(b)(1), RULE 12(b)(6), AND RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S CLAIMS ON BEHALF OF NON-STATE PUBLIC ENTITIES) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 17(a), RULE 12(b)(1), RULE 12(b)(6), AND RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S CLAIMS ON BEHALF OF NON-STATE PUBLIC ENTITIES) filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Exhibit C)(Drane, W.)
August 17, 2011 218 REPLY BRIEF re 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS GROUNDS filed by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.) Modified on 8/19/2011 (rpg).
August 8, 2011 217 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SIXTH SET OF REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
August 3, 2011 216 DECLARATION re 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS GROUNDS (Decl. of Richard Schwartz, Esq.) by State of New York. (Kasha, Jeremy) Modified on 8/19/2011 (rpg).
August 3, 2011 215 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS GROUNDS filed by State of New York.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2011. (Kasha, Jeremy) Modified on 8/19/2011 (rpg).
August 3, 2011 214 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 163 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 17(a), RULE 12(b)(1), RULE 12(b)(6), AND RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S CLAIMS ON BEHALF OF NON-STATE PUBLIC ENTITIES) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 17(a), RULE 12(b)(1), RULE 12(b)(6), AND RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S CLAIMS ON BEHALF OF NON-STATE PUBLIC ENTITIES) filed by State of New York.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2011. (Kasha, Jeremy)
August 3, 2011 213 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 161 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S DONNELLY ACT DAMAGES CLAIM ON BEHALF OF CONSUMERS) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S DONNELLY ACT DAMAGES CLAIM ON BEHALF OF CONSUMERS) filed by State of New York.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2011. (Kasha, Jeremy)
August 3, 2011 212 NOTICE of ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION (HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY) by Intel Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena, # 2 Schedule A, # 3 Exhibit A & B to Schedule A, # 4 Proof of Service)(Drane, W.)
July 28, 2011 211 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 209 Revised Scheduling Order (Dispositive Motions due by 10/14/2011). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/28/11. (ntl)
July 28, 2011 210 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding Proposed Form of Order Re Scheduling - re 209 Proposed Order. (Drane, W.)
July 28, 2011 209 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling re 207 Order,,,,,, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
July 27, 2011 208 NOTICE of Address Change (Keker & Van Nest LLP, effective August 1, 2011) by Intel Corporation (Horwitz, Richard)
July 26, 2011 207 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' joint submission regarding scheduling (D.I. 205 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings in this matter: (i) "NY Proposed Deadline" for completion of document production (D.I. 205 at 2) is adopted; (ii) Intel's "proposal" (D.I. 205 at 5) paragraphs 3-9 is adopted; (iii) the close of expert discovery is moved to October 7, 2011; and (iv) the case dispositive motion deadline is moved to October 14, 2011. The Court adopts these modifications to the existing schedule as reasonable in light of the recent disputes and rulings relating to representative discovery from New York entities. The Court finds New York's proposed dates for completion of document production to be reasonable and also agrees with Intel that Intel may take additional or supplemental Rule 30(b)(6) depositions of the New York entities that will be producing further documents if Intel believes, in good faith, based on the new document productions, further depositions are required. By extending slightly the deadlines for expert discovery and filing of case dispositive motions, the Court ensures that New York will "cure its production deficiencies within a reasonable time frame that does not prejudice Intel or undermine other case deadlines" (D.I. 205 at 4). IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than July 28, 2011, the parties shall jointly submit a proposed form of order setting out the schedule for the remainder of this matter consistent with the rulings contained in this oral order. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/26/11. (ntl)
July 26, 2011 206 NOTICE OF SERVICE of EXPERT REPORT OF JUDITH A CHEVALIER AND FREDERICK JAY POLLACK by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
July 25, 2011 205 Joint Letter to Court from NY and Intel regarding Joint Letter re: Competing Scheduling Proposals, per Court Order. (Kasha, Jeremy)
July 25, 2011 204 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIFTH SET OF REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
July 22, 2011 203 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum upon IBM Corp., c/o Michael A. Paskin by Intel Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Drane, W.)
July 21, 2011 202 NOTICE of ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION (DELL INCORPORATED) by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
July 18, 2011 201 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' joint letter of July 15, 2011 (D.I. 200 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiff, State of New York, shall respond to Intel's scheduling proposal by July 22, 2011. Thereafter, the parties shall meet and confer and advise the Court, by joint letter no later than July 25, 2011, of their respective scheduling proposal(s). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/18/11. (ntl)
July 18, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Motions to Dismiss and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to 8/3/2011 -- Set Briefing Schedule: re 161 MOTION to Dismiss; 163 MOTION to Dismiss; 166 INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Answering Briefs due 8/3/2011, Reply Briefs due 8/17/2011). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/15/11. (ntl)
July 15, 2011 200 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Schwartz and W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding July 14, 2011 TELECONFERENCE RULINGS AND IMPACT ON CASE SCHEDULE. (Drane, W.)
July 14, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 7/14/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
July 14, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney R. James Slaughter for Intel Corporation added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
July 13, 2011 199 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Motions to Dismiss and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to 8/3/2011 - filed by State of New York. (Kasha, Jeremy)
July 13, 2011 198 NOTICE of ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION (IBM CORP.), SCHEDULED FOR JULY 27, 2011 by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
July 12, 2011 197 NOTICE of ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION (DUANE ZITZNER) by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
July 12, 2011 196 REDACTED VERSION of 192 Declaration of Daniel S. Floyd with Exhibits A-W by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-N, # 2 Exhibit O-W)(Drane, W.)
July 12, 2011 195 REDACTED VERSION of 190 Letter to The Honorable Leanord P. Stark by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
July 12, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 194 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. James Slaughter of Keker & Van Nest LLP filed by Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/12/11. (ntl)
July 11, 2011 194 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. James Slaughter of Keker & Van Nest LLP - filed by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
July 8, 2011 193 Letter to Judge Stark from NYAG regarding Opposition re: Intel Discovery Letter Motion dated 7/7/11 - re 190 Letter. (Kasha, Jeremy)
July 7, 2011 192 SEALED DECLARATION re 191 Exhibit to a Document, 190 Letter Daniel S. Floyd by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
July 7, 2011 191 EXHIBIT re 190 Letter Proposed Order by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
July 7, 2011 190 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Motion to Compel Discovery. (Horwitz, Richard)
July 6, 2011 189 NOTICE OF SERVICE of NY's 6th Doc Request & Notice of Videotape Deposition by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
July 6, 2011 188 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH SET OF REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
July 5, 2011 187 Featured Case ORDER Setting Teleconference : A Discovery Teleconference is set for 7/14/2011 at 12:00 PM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/5/11. (ntl)
July 1, 2011 186 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) MICHAEL TAYLOR on July 19, 2011, at 9:00 a.m. by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
July 1, 2011 185 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) JULIE CASSADA on July 19, 2011, at 12:00 p.m. by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
July 1, 2011 184 NOTICE OF SERVICE of SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURES OF INTEL CORPORATION PURSUANT TO RULE 26(e)(1) by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
June 30, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: Letter docketed at D.I. 184 deleted per request of counsel (docketed in wrong case). (ntl)
June 29, 2011 183 NOTICE OF SERVICE of INTEL CORPORATION'S THIRD SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
June 23, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Elizabeth Richardson-Royer for Intel Corporation added for electronic noticing. (nms)
June 22, 2011 182 NOTICE OF SERVICE of NY Responses to 6th Set of Interrogatories & Responses to 2nd Set of Requests For Admission by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
June 21, 2011 181 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Fifth Set of Document Requests & 30b6 Deposition Notice (correcting N.O.S. filed earlier on 6/21/11) by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
June 21, 2011 180 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 4th Set of Document Requests & 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
June 16, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 178 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Beth Richardson-Royer of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP filed by Intel Corporation, 179 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Debra Matrin filed by State of New York. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/16/11. (ntl)
June 16, 2011 179 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Debra Matrin - filed by State of New York. (Zain, Saami)
June 15, 2011 178 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Beth Richardson-Royer of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP - filed by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
June 9, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 177 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Roger Kinsey filed by State of New York. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/9/11. (ntl)
June 8, 2011 177 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Roger Kinsey - filed by State of New York. (Zain, Saami)
June 6, 2011 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of notice of deposition & document request by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
June 3, 2011 175 REDACTED VERSION of 168 Declaration of Daniel S. Floyd with Exhibit A by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
June 3, 2011 174 REDACTED VERSION of 165 Declaration of Daniel S. Floyd with Exhibits A-S by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
June 3, 2011 173 REDACTED VERSION of 167 MEMORANDUM in Support, INTEL CORPORATION'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS GROUNDS by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
June 3, 2011 172 REDACTED VERSION of 164 MEMORANDUM in Support,, INTEL CORPORATION'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION UNDER RULE 17(a), RULE 12(b)(1), RULE 12(b)(6) and RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S CLAIMS ON BEHALF OF NON STATE PUBLIC ENTITIES by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
June 3, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: PDF attached to d.i. 170 deleted and replaced per counsel's request on 6/3/2011. ( Notice of electronic filing re-generated to all counsel of record ). (rpg)
June 2, 2011 171 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPED) NYS REGARDING AGGREGATE PC INITIATIVE MONTHLY REPORTS, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 30(b)(6) on July 14, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Horwitz, Richard)
June 2, 2011 170 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (Videotaped) NYS CIO AND CIO COUNCIL, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 30(b)(6) on June 13, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Horwitz, Richard) (rpg).
May 31, 2011 NOTICE: Per Judge Stark's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and one (1) copy of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office one additional copy of D.I. # 162 , 164 , and 167 . (ntl)
May 31, 2011 169 NOTICE of SUBPOENA AD TESTIFICANDUM (ISSUED TO SENECA DATA INC.) by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
May 27, 2011 168 SEALED DECLARATION re 167 MEMORANDUM in Support, DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. FLOYD WITH EXHIBIT A by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
May 27, 2011 167 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS GROUNDS INTEL CORPORATION'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS GROUNDS filed by Intel Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/13/2011. (Drane, W.) Modified on 8/19/2011 (rpg).
May 27, 2011 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS GROUNDS - filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drane, W.) Modified on 8/19/2011 (rpg).
May 27, 2011 165 SEALED DECLARATION re 164 MEMORANDUM in Support,, (DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. FLOYD WITH EXHIBITS A-S) by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
May 27, 2011 164 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re 163 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 17(a), RULE 12(b)(1), RULE 12(b)(6), AND RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S CLAIMS ON BEHALF OF NON-STATE PUBLIC ENTITIES) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 17(a), RULE 12(b)(1), RULE 12(b)(6), AND RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S CLAIMS ON BEHALF OF NON-STATE PUBLIC ENTITIES) filed by Intel Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/13/2011. (Drane, W.)
May 27, 2011 163 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 17(a), RULE 12(b)(1), RULE 12(b)(6), AND RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S CLAIMS ON BEHALF OF NON-STATE PUBLIC ENTITIES) - filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drane, W.)
May 27, 2011 162 MEMORANDUM in Support re 161 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S DONNELLY ACT DAMAGES CLAIM ON BEHALF OF CONSUMERS) MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S DONNELLY ACT DAMAGES CLAIM ON BEHALF OF CONSUMERS) filed by Intel Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/13/2011. (Drane, W.)
May 27, 2011 161 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (INTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO NEW YORK'S DONNELLY ACT DAMAGES CLAIM ON BEHALF OF CONSUMERS) - filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drane, W.)
May 27, 2011 160 NOTICE OF SERVICE of four Rule 45 subpoenas by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
May 27, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 159 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Linda Gargiulo, Heather Rubinstein, James Morrissey, John Shields, John Belford, and Kimberly Kinirons filed by State of New York. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/27/11. (ntl)
May 27, 2011 159 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Linda Gargiulo, Heather Rubinstein, James Morrissey, John Shields, John Belford, and Kimberly Kinirons - filed by State of New York. (Zain, Saami)
May 23, 2011 158 NOTICE of ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION (JOSEPH LEE) WITH EXHIBIT 1 AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
May 20, 2011 157 NOTICE OF SERVICE of INTEL CORPORATION'S SECOND SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (NOS. 34-65) TO PLAINTIFF STATE OF NEW YORK, BY ATTORNEY GENERAL ERIC T. SCHNEIDERMAN by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
May 20, 2011 156 NOTICE OF SERVICE of INTEL CORPORATION'S SIXTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 22-25) TO PLAINTIFF STATE OF NEW YORK, BY ATTORNEY GENERAL ERIC T. SCHNEIDERMAN by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
May 13, 2011 155 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 45 Subpoena Duces Tecum by State of New York.(Zain, Saami)
May 12, 2011 154 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER -- Denying 87 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by State of New York. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/12/11. (ntl)
May 12, 2011 153 Official Transcript of Oral Argument and Status Conference held on May 3, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2011. (bpg)
May 10, 2011 152 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 45 Subpoena Duces Tecum by State of New York.(Zain, Saami)
May 10, 2011 151 Featured Case ORDER Extending Discovery Deadlines and Granting Intel Leave to File Legal Motions in Advance of the Date for Case Dispositive Motions (Discovery due by 7/31/2011). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/10/11. (ntl)
May 9, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 147 Stipulation and Order re authenticity of electronic documents. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/9/11. (ntl)
May 9, 2011 150 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from W. Harding Drane, Jr. regarding [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Deadlines and Granting Intel Corporation Leave to File Legal Motions in Advance of the Date for Case Dispositive Motions - re 149 Proposed Order. (Drane, W.)
May 9, 2011 149 PROPOSED ORDER Extending Discovery Deadlines and Granting Intel Corporation Leave to File Legal Motions in Advance of the Date for Case Dispositive Motions by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
May 5, 2011 148 NOTICE of ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION (JOSEPH BEYERS AND JEFF GROUDAN) by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
May 5, 2011 147 Joint STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE AUTHENTICITY OF ELECTRONIC DOCUMENTS by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
May 3, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Motion Hearing/Status Conference held on 5/3/2011 re 87 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by State of New York. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
May 2, 2011 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response to Intel's 5th Set of Interrogatories by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
April 29, 2011 145 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S APRIL 11, 2011 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
April 28, 2011 144 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Schwartz and Richard L. Horwitz regarding Joint Status Conference Report. (Horwitz, Richard)
April 28, 2011 143 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on April 7, 2011 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2011. (bpg)
April 27, 2011 142 NOTICE of ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION (MICHAEL WINKLER) WITH SUBPOENA AND PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED, SCHEDULED FOR MAY 6, 2011 by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
April 26, 2011 141 Letter to Clerk of Court regarding Caption Change. (Schwartz, Richard)
April 25, 2011 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 45 Subpoena Duces Tecum by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
April 21, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 138 Stipulation filed by Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/21/11. (ntl)
April 21, 2011 139 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD SET OF REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
April 21, 2011 138 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING LENGTH OF THE JOINT STATUS REPORT TO BE SUBMITTED IN ADVANCE OF THE MAY 3, 2011 STATUS CONFERENCE by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
April 20, 2011 137 NOTICE of ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION (JERI CALLAWAY) WITH EXHIBIT 1 AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
April 19, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Adam Lauridsen,Brook Dooley,Paula L. Blizzard for Intel Corporation added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
April 15, 2011 136 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 45 Subpoena Duces Tecum by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
April 11, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 134 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert A. Van Nest, Paula L. Blizzard, Brook Dooley and R. Adam Lauridsen of Keker & Van Nest LLP filed by Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/11/11. (ntl)
April 11, 2011 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of FRCP 30b6 Notice to Def. Intel by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
April 11, 2011 134 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert A. Van Nest, Paula L. Blizzard, Brook Dooley and R. Adam Lauridsen of Keker & Van Nest LLP - filed by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
April 7, 2011 133 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: In accordance with the discussion with counsel during the teleconference today, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference is scheduled for 5/3/11 to begin at the conclusion of the Hearing scheduled for that day at 3:00 p.m. Counsel shall submit a joint 3 page status report due 3 business days before the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/7/11. (ntl)
April 7, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 4/7/2011. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
April 6, 2011 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION (LOUIS KIM) WITH SUBPOENA AND PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
April 4, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: PDF attached to d.i. 131 deleted and replaced per counsel's telephone request ion 4/4/2011. (rpg)
April 4, 2011 131 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding NEW YORK'S MOTION TO QUASH INTEL'S RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION ON DOCUMENT RETENTION - re 129 MOTION to Quash Rule 30(b)(6) Notice to NYAG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Horwitz, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2011: # 3 Letter) (rpg).
April 4, 2011 130 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) resp. to req. for adm; (2) obj. to depo notice; (3) obj. to interrogs.; (4) obj. to deposition; (5) obj. to deposition; (6) obj. to doc req. by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
April 1, 2011 129 MOTION to Quash Rule 30(b)(6) Notice to NYAG - filed by State of New York. (Kasha, Jeremy)
March 30, 2011 128 Order Setting Teleconference: Discovery Teleconference set for 4/7/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/30/11. (ntl)
March 28, 2011 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE of INTEL CORPORATION'S FIFTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 19-21) TO PLAINTIFF STATE OF NEW YORK, BY ATTORNEY GENERAL ERIC T. SCHNEIDERMAN by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
March 22, 2011 126 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Document Request by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
March 21, 2011 125 REDACTED VERSION of 120 Notice (Other) NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPONEA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION (HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY) by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C Redacted, # 2 Exhibit D, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit D, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit E, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit E, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit E, Part 3)(Drane, W.)
March 16, 2011 124 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE DEPOSITION) MICHELLE ST. JOCK on April 6, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
March 16, 2011 123 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (Videotape Deposition) Kelly Belenchia on April 6, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
March 15, 2011 122 NOTICE of ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION (JOSEPH BEYERS) WITH EXHIBIT 1 AND PROOFS OF SERVICE OF FRANK M. HINMAN AND JOLYN PARKER ATTACHED by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
March 15, 2011 121 NOTICE of ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION (GROUDAN, LEE, KIM, CALLAWAY) WITH EXHIBITS 1-4 AND PROOFS OF SERVICE OF FRANK M. HINMAN AND JOLYN PARKER ATTACHED by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
March 15, 2011 120 SEALED NOTICE of ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION (HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY) WITH SUBPOENA, SCHEULE A, EXHIBITS A-E AND PROOFS OF SERVICE OF FRANK M. HINMAN AND JOLYN PARKER ATTACHED by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
February 22, 2011 119 NOTICE OF SERVICE of INTEL CORPORATION'S THIRD SET OF REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (NOS. 56-66) TO PLAINTIFF STATE OF NEW YORK, BY ATTORNEY GENERAL ERIC T. SCHNEIDERMAN by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 118 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) THE OFFICE FOR PEOPLE WITH DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES on March 29, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 117 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) THE NEW YORK DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION on March 31, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 116 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) BOCES ERIE on April 8, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 115 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) THE CITY OF BUFFALO BOARD OF EDUCATION on April 6, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 114 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) SOUTHERN WESTCHESTER BOCES) on April 1, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 113 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK on April 12, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 112 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) BOCES NASSAU on April 14, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 111 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) BOCES MADISON-ONEIDA on April 21, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 110 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) THE METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY on April 26, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 109 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) WESTHAMPTON BEACH UNION FREE SCHOOL DISTRICT on April 28, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 108 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) NEW YORK CITY on MAY 3, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 107 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) SUNY AT STONY BROOK on March 24, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 106 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) THE NEW YORK DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH on APRIL 5, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 105 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) THE NEW YORK OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION on MARCH 8, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 104 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPE) MONROE COUNTY on APRIL 19, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 103 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPED) THE DIVISION OF STATE POLICE on MARCH 22, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 102 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPED) NEW YORK CITY BOARD OF EDUCATION on MAY 5, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 101 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPED) THE NEW YORK DEPARTMENT OF LAW on MARCH 17, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 100 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (VIDEOTAPED) THE NEW YORK OFFICE FOR TECHNOLOGY on MARCH 15, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 99 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (Videotaped) THE NEW YORK DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONAL SERVICES on March 10, 2011 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 16, 2011 98 NOTICE OF SERVICE of SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURES OF INTEL CORPORATION PURSUANT TO RULE 26(e)(1) by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
February 11, 2011 97 NOTICE of TAKING DEPOSITION OF STATE OF NEW YORK AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, DEPOSITION TO TAKE PLACE ON MARCH 30, 2011 by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
February 7, 2011 96 Featured Case ORAL ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 87 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/7/11. (ntl)
January 25, 2011 95 NOTICE OF SERVICE of INTEL CORPORATION'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND DEFENDANT INTEL CORPORATION'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
January 12, 2011 94 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Intel Corporation re 87 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint [CORRECTED]. (Horwitz, Richard)
January 11, 2011 93 NOTICE of ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM TO HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY by Intel Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit Schedule A, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Drane, W.)
January 10, 2011 92 REPLY BRIEF re 87 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint [CORRECTED] filed by State of New York. (Kasha, Jeremy)
December 29, 2010 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 2nd Set of Interrogatories & 2nd Set of Doc Requests by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
December 27, 2010 90 DECLARATION re 89 Memorandum in Opposition, DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. FLOYD IN SUPPORT OF INTEL CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO THE STATE OF NEW YORK'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS COMPLAINT by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
December 27, 2010 89 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 87 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint [CORRECTED] INTEL CORPORATION'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE STATE OF NEW YORK'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS COMPLAINT filed by Intel Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/6/2011. (Drane, W.)
December 10, 2010 88 Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 9/29/2011 at 4:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/10/2010. (cak)
December 9, 2010 87 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint [CORRECTED] - filed by State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint)(Kasha, Jeremy)
December 9, 2010 86 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint - filed by State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint)(Kasha, Jeremy)
November 22, 2010 85 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on November 4, 2010 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/13/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2011. (bpg)
November 17, 2010 84 Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 12/10/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/16/2010. (cak)
November 12, 2010 83 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (Videotaped) State of New York - Regarding Certain Documents Produced by Plaintiff State of New York on December 15, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
November 12, 2010 82 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (Videotaped) State of New York Regarding The Office For Technology on December 15, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
November 12, 2010 81 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (Videotaped) State of New York Regarding The Procurement Committee on December 16, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
November 12, 2010 80 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' joint letter of November 9, 2010 (D.I. 78), and having considered the arguments the parties made in previous filings (D.I. 74, 75) and during the teleconference of November 4, 2010, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT New York's proposal for proceeding with representative discovery, as outlined in the November 9 letter, is ADOPTED. The Court finds that, under the circumstances -- including the relevance of the discovery sought by Intel and the burden on New York in producing it -- New York's proposal is more reasonable than Intel's. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/12/10. (ntl)
November 11, 2010 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of INTEL CORPORATION'S FOURTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 14-18) TO PLAINTIFF STATE OF NEW YORK, BY ATTORNEY GENERAL ANDREW CUOMO by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
November 9, 2010 78 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz (on behalf of Intel Corporation) and Richard L. Schwartz (on behalf of State of New York) regarding submitting their proposals re: Intels Motion to Compel, as ordered by the Court on November 4, 2010 - re Telephone Conference. (Horwitz, Richard)
November 4, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 11/4/2010. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
November 4, 2010 77 REDACTED VERSION of 74 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark with Exhibits A-E by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D-E)(Drane, W.)
November 2, 2010 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Intel Corporation's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and 2) Intel Corporation's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
November 2, 2010 75 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition to Intel Letter Motion to Compel filed by State of New York.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/12/2010. (Kasha, Jeremy)
November 1, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. 74 has been modified to reflect that the filing is under seal. (nms)
November 1, 2010 74 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark with Exhibits A-E from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Compel Discovery. (Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 11/1/2010 (nms).
October 29, 2010 73 Featured Case ORDER Cancelling Discovery Teleconference set for 11/3/2010 03:30 PM and Resetting Teleconference: ( Discovery Telephone Conference reset for 11/4/2010 12:30 PM before Judge Leonard P. Stark ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/29/2010. (rpg)
October 29, 2010 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Emily Granrud,James Yoon,Saami Zain for State of New York added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
October 27, 2010 72 Order Setting Teleconference: Discovery Teleconference set for 11/3/2010 03:30 PM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/27/10. (ntl)
October 25, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 65 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Emily Granrud, Saami Zain, James Yoon filed by State of New York. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/25/2010. (rpg)
October 21, 2010 71 CASE REFERRED to Judge Thynge for Mediation. (cak)
October 21, 2010 70 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 12/9/2010. Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2010. Discovery due by 6/1/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 10/3/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/18/2012. (10) ten day Jury Trial set for 2/14/2012; Day 1 to begin at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Days 2 through 10, 2/15/2012 through 2/27/2012, to begin at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/19/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rpg)
October 19, 2010 69 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on October 5, 2010 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2011. (bpg)
October 15, 2010 68 DECLARATION re 65 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Emily Granrud, Saami Zain, James Yoon Decl. of Saami Zain by State of New York. (Kasha, Jeremy)
October 15, 2010 67 DECLARATION re 65 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Emily Granrud, Saami Zain, James Yoon (Decl. of James Yoon) by State of New York. (Kasha, Jeremy)
October 15, 2010 66 DECLARATION re 65 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Emily Granrud, Saami Zain, James Yoon (Decl. of Emily Granrud) by State of New York. (Kasha, Jeremy)
October 15, 2010 65 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Emily Granrud, Saami Zain, James Yoon - filed by State of New York. (Kasha, Jeremy)
October 8, 2010 64 Letter to THE HONORABLE LEONARD P. STARK from RICHARD L. HORWITZ regarding ENCLOSING PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER PURSUANT TO 10-05-10 TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - re 59 Order Setting Teleconference. (Attachments: # 1 [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER)(Horwitz, Richard)
October 7, 2010 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Frank M. Hinman, Donn P. Pickett, Brian C. Rocca, Sujal M. Shah, and Susan J. Welch for Intel Corporation added for electronic noticing. (nms)
October 5, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 10/5/2010. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
September 30, 2010 63 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (Amended), Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6), with Schedule A, of Plaintiff State of New York, by Attorney General Andrew Cuomo (re: OSC), on Friday, October 8, 2010, at 9:00 A.M. by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
September 30, 2010 62 NOTICE to Take Deposition of (Amended), Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6), with Schedule A, of Plaintiff State of New York, by Attorney General Andrew Cuomo (re: OGS) on Thursday, October 7, 2010, at 9:00 A.M. by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
September 30, 2010 61 Joint STATUS REPORT by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
September 30, 2010 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories & First Set of Document Requests by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
September 17, 2010 59 Order Setting Status Teleconference: Status Telephone Conference set for 10/5/2010 11:00 AM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. ( Please see order for details regarding joint status report ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/17/2010. (rpg)
September 15, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 55 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Donn P. Pickett, Frank M. Hinman, Sujal J. Shah, Brian C. Rocca and Susan J. Welch of Bingham McCutchen LLP filed by Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/15/10. (ntl)
September 15, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 57 Stipulation and Protective Order Regarding Expert Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/15/10. (ntl)
September 15, 2010 58 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Richard L. Horwitz regarding Stipulation and Protective Order Regarding Expert Discovery and Request for Status Conference - re 57 Stipulation. (Horwitz, Richard)
September 15, 2010 57 Joint STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
September 10, 2010 56 MDL ORDER Reassigning Litigation to Judge Stark. Signed by Chairman John G. Heyburn II on 9/10/10. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01717-LPS et al.(ntl)
September 10, 2010 55 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Donn P. Pickett, Frank M. Hinman, Sujal J. Shah, Brian C. Rocca and Susan J. Welch of Bingham McCutchen LLP - filed by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
August 19, 2010 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Resp. to 2nd Set Doc Req (Nos. 42-55) and (2) Resp. to 3d Set of Interrogs (Nos. 12-13) by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
August 17, 2010 Case reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (maw)
July 13, 2010 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intel Corporation's Second Request for the Production of Documents (nOs. 42-55) to Plaintiff State of New York, by Attorney General Andrew Cuomo by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
July 13, 2010 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intel Corporation's Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 12-13) to Plaintiff State of New York, By Attorney General Andrew Cuomo by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
July 9, 2010 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff NY's Objections to Deposition Notices found at: 38 , 43 , 40 , 35 , 41 , 36 , 45 , 46 , 39 , 37 , 44 ,and 42 , by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy) Modified on 7/12/2010 (nms).
June 30, 2010 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service re Responses to RFAs and 2nd Set of Interrogs by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
June 22, 2010 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 45 Subpoena Duces Tecum by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
June 15, 2010 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of NY Responses & Objections to First Set of Intel Interrogatories re 33 Notice of Service by State of New York. Related document: 33 Notice of Service filed by Intel Corporation.(Kasha, Jeremy)
June 11, 2010 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response to Intel's 1st Set of Requests for Production re 32 Notice of Service by State of New York. Related document: 32 Notice of Service filed by Intel Corporation.(Kasha, Jeremy)
June 2, 2010 46 NOTICE to Take Deposition of NYAG Designee of State University of New York at Albany on August 12, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
June 2, 2010 45 NOTICE to Take Deposition of NYAG Designee of New York's Office of Court Administration on August 12, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
June 2, 2010 44 NOTICE to Take Deposition of NYAG Designee of New York's State Education Department on August 18, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
June 2, 2010 43 NOTICE to Take Deposition of NYAG Designee of New York's Office of the State Comptroller on August 11, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
June 2, 2010 42 NOTICE to Take Deposition of NYAG Designee of State of New York's Office of Temporary and Disability Assistance on August 18, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
June 2, 2010 41 NOTICE to Take Deposition of NYAG Designee of New York's Office of General Services on August 10, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
June 2, 2010 40 NOTICE to Take Deposition of NYAG Designee of New York's Office of Attorney General, Department of Law, Division of Administration on August 17, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
June 2, 2010 39 NOTICE to Take Deposition of NYAG Designee of New York's Department of Taxation and Finance on August 13, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
June 2, 2010 38 NOTICE to Take Deposition of NYAG designee of New York's Department of Transportation on August 12, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
June 2, 2010 37 NOTICE to Take Deposition of NYAG Designee of New York's Department of Labor on August 16, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
June 2, 2010 36 NOTICE to Take Deposition of NYAG designee of New York's Department of Health on August 13, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
June 2, 2010 35 NOTICE to Take Deposition of NYAG designee of State of New York's Department of Motor Vehicles on August 17, 2010 by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
May 25, 2010 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intel Corporation's Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff State of New York, by Attorney General Andrew Cuomo and Intel Corporation's First Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff State of New York, by Attorney General Andrew Cuomo by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
May 11, 2010 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intel Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff State of New York, By Attorney General Andrew Cuomo by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
May 10, 2010 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intel Corporation's First Set of Request For The Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
May 6, 2010 31 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 30 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply In Support of Its Opposition to the State of New York's Proposed 20 Rule 16 Scheduling Order, filed by State of New York.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/17/2010. (Kasha, Jeremy) Modified on 5/7/2010 (nms).
May 6, 2010 Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re 30 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply In Support of Its Opposition to the State of New York's Proposed Rule 16 Scheduling Order. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/24/2010. (nms)
May 5, 2010 30 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply In Support of Its Opposition to the State of New York's Proposed Rule 16 Scheduling Order - filed by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
May 3, 2010 29 REPLY BRIEF re 20 MOTION for Scheduling Order & Reply Declaration filed by State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reply Decl. of Richard L. Schwartz)(Kasha, Jeremy)
May 3, 2010 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 45 Subpoena Duces Tecum by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
April 22, 2010 27 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order re 20 MOTION for Scheduling Order, 26 Declaration, 25 Memorandum in Opposition, 21 Opening Brief in Support by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
April 22, 2010 26 DECLARATION of Michael L. Denger re 25 Memorandum in Opposition, by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Drane, W.) Modified on 4/23/2010 (nms).
April 22, 2010 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 20 MOTION for Scheduling Order, filed by Intel Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/3/2010. (Drane, W.) Modified on 4/23/2010 (nms).
April 15, 2010 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of NY's Initial Disclosures by State of New York.(Kasha, Jeremy)
April 13, 2010 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Intel Corporation Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Intel Corporation.(Drane, W.)
April 6, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Memorandum in Support and Declaration that were attached to D.I. 20 have been removed from the filing, and have been re-filed on the docket at D.I. 21 and 22. Counsel will for the future not couple such filings together. (nms)
April 5, 2010 22 DECLARATION of Richard Schwartz re 20 MOTION for Scheduling Order, by State of New York. (nms)
April 5, 2010 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re 20 MOTION for Scheduling Order, filed by State of New York.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/22/2010. (nms)
April 5, 2010 20 MOTION for Scheduling Order - filed by State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kasha, Jeremy) Modified on 4/6/2010 (nms).
January 27, 2010 19 NOTICE of (1) Stipulation Incorporating Discovery Record from MDL Docket No. 05-17-17-JJF into Civil Action No. 09-827 (JJF) and (2) Stipulation Relating to the Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order Entered in MDL Docket No. 05-1717-JJF and Civil Action No. 05-441-JJB by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
January 19, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert E. Cooper, Daniel S. Floyd, Mark E. Weber, Kay Kochenderfer, Rod Stone, Samuel Liversidge, Jay P. Srinivasan, Joseph Kattan and Michael L. Denger (all of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP)MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert E. Cooper, Daniel S. Floyd, Mark E. Weber, Kay Kochenderfer, Rod Stone, Samuel Liversidge, Jay P. Srinivasan, Joseph Kattan and Michael L. Denger (all of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP)MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert E. Cooper, Daniel S. Floyd, Mark E. Weber, Kay Kochenderfer, Rod Stone, Samuel Liversidge, Jay P. Srinivasan, Joseph Kattan and Michael L. Denger (all of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP) filed by Intel Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 1/19/2010. (nms)
January 15, 2010 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert E. Cooper, Daniel S. Floyd, Mark E. Weber, Kay Kochenderfer, Rod Stone, Samuel Liversidge, Jay P. Srinivasan, Joseph Kattan and Michael L. Denger (all of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP) - filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certification of Robert E. Cooper, # 3 Certification of Daniel S. Floyd, # 4 Certification of Mark E. Weber, # 5 Certification of Kay Kochenderfer, # 6 Certification of Samuel Liversidge, # 7 Certification of Jay P. Srinivasan, # 8 Certification of Joseph Kattan, # 9 Certification of Michael L. Denge, # 10 Certification of Rod Stone)(Drane, W.) Modified on 1/19/2010 (nms).
January 12, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 13 Stipulation Incorporating Discovery Record From MDL Docket No. 05-1717-JJF Into Civil Action No. 09-827-JJF, filed by Intel Corporation (See Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 1/12/2010. (nms)
January 12, 2010 17 Featured Case ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation Relating to the Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order entered in MDL Docket 05-1717-JJF and Civil Action No. 05-441-JJF, filed by Intel Corporation (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 1/12/2010. (nms)
January 12, 2010 16 REDACTED VERSION of 14 Answer to Complaint by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
January 7, 2010 15 STIPULATION Relating to The Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order Entered in MDL Docket No. 06-1717-JJF and Civil Action No. 05-441-JJF by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
January 5, 2010 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. 14 has been modified to reflect that the filing is under seal. (nms)
January 5, 2010 14 SEALED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Intel Corporation.(Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 1/5/2010 (nms).
December 30, 2009 13 STIPULATION Incorporating Discovery Record From MDL Docket No. 05-1717 JJF Into Civil Action No. 09-827 (JJF) by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 7, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 12 Second Stipulation to Extend Time To Answer Complaint, filed by Intel Corporation. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Intel Corporation answer due 1/5/2010. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 12/7/2009. (nms)
December 4, 2009 12 STIPULATION Second Stipulation to Extend Time to answer Complaint (to January 5, 2010) re 1 Complaint, by Intel Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
November 19, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy R. Kasha, Esq. filed by State of New York. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/19/2009. (nms)
November 19, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard L. Schwartz, Esq. filed by State of New York. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/19/2009. (nms)
November 19, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Berlin, Esq. filed by State of New York. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/19/2009. (nms)
November 17, 2009 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy R. Kasha, Esq. - filed by State of New York. (nms)
November 17, 2009 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard L. Schwartz, Esq. - filed by State of New York. (nms)
November 17, 2009 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Berlin, Esq. - filed by State of New York. (nms)
November 17, 2009 8 Featured Case ORDER Granting 7 MOTION to Proceed Pro Hac Vice Without Association of Delaware Counsel filed by State of New York. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/17/2009. (nms)
November 17, 2009 7 MOTION to Proceed Pro Hac Vice Without Association of Delaware Counsel - filed by State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Pro Hac Vice Motion for Michael Berlin, # 2 Pro Hac Vice Motion for Richard L. Schwartz, # 3 Pro Hac Vice Motion for Jeremy R. Kasha, # 4 Cover letter to the Clerk of the Court)(nms)
November 17, 2009 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Richard L. Horwitz and W. Harding Drane, Jr., of the law firm of Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP, as counsel for Defendant Intel Corporation by Intel Corporation (Drane, W.)
November 16, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 5 Stipulation to Extend the time to Answer the Complaint filed by Intel Corporation (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Intel Corporation answer due 12/11/2009). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 11/16/2009. (nms)
November 16, 2009 5 STIPULATION Extend Time to Respond to Complaint to December 11, 2009 re 1 Complaint, by Intel Corporation. (Drane, W.)
November 10, 2009 Case assigned to Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. Please include the initials of the Judge (JJF) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
November 5, 2009 4 Local Counsel Letter sent to Michael Berlin. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 12/8/2009. (dzs, )
November 4, 2009 3 Letter to Clerk from Richard L. Schwartz, Assistant Attorney General regarding designation of a related case - re 1 Complaint,. (dzs, )
November 4, 2009 Summons Issued as to Intel Corporation on 11/4/2009. (dzs, )
November 4, 2009 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzs, )
November 4, 2009 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Intel Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 1362.) - filed by State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Acknowledgement of Consent Form)(dzs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: State of New York v. Intel Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]