Cooper Notification Inc. v. Twitter Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Cooper Notification Inc.
Defendant: Twitter Inc., Everbridge Inc. and Rave Wireless Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00865
Filed: November 13, 2009
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2010 34 REPLY to 32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by Cooper Notification Inc..(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/29/2010 (nms).
March 19, 2010 33 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Rave Wireless Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
March 19, 2010 32 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Cooper Notification Inc. by Rave Wireless Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
March 19, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 31 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to March 19, 2010, filed by Rave Wireless Inc., (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Rave Wireless Inc. answer due 3/19/2010). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/19/2010. (nms)
March 9, 2010 30 REPLY to 27 Answer to Amended Complaint, and Counterclaims, by Cooper Notification Inc..(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 3/10/2010 (nms).
March 1, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 26 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to March 12, 2010, filed by Rave Wireless Inc. (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Rave Wireless Inc. answer due 3/12/2010). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/1/2010. (nms)
March 1, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Leach and Attorney Daniel W. McDonald filed by Federal Signal Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 3/1/2010. (nms)
February 26, 2010 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas J. Leach and Attorney Daniel W. McDonald - filed by Federal Signal Corporation. (Higgins, James)
February 26, 2010 28 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Federal Signal Corporation. (Higgins, James)
February 26, 2010 27 ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Cooper Notification Inc., by Federal Signal Corporation.(Shaw, John) Modified on 3/1/2010 (nms).
February 26, 2010 26 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to March 12, 2010 - filed by Rave Wireless Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
February 22, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lynn H. Pasahow, J. David Hadden, David D. Schumann, Elizabeth J. White, and Phillip J. Haack filed by Twitter Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 2/22/2010. (nms)
February 19, 2010 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lynn H. Pasahow, J. David Hadden, David D. Schumann, Elizabeth J. White, and Phillip J. Haack - filed by Twitter Inc.. (Day, John)
February 16, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 23 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Federal Signal Corp. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to 14 Amended Complaint to February 26, filed by Federal Signal Corporation, Cooper Notification Inc.. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Federal Signal Corporation answer due 2/26/2010. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 2/16/2010. (nms)
February 16, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 24 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to February 26, 2010 filed by Rave Wireless Inc.. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Rave Wireless Inc. answer due 2/26/2010. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 2/16/2010. (nms)
February 16, 2010 24 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to February 26, 2010 - filed by Rave Wireless Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
February 15, 2010 23 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Federal Signal Corp. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (D.I. 14) to February 26, 2010 - filed by Cooper Notification Inc., Federal Signal Corporation. (Shaw, John)
February 12, 2010 22 REPLY/ANSWER to 19 Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaims, by Cooper Notification Inc..(Rovner, Philip) Modified on 2/16/2010 (nms).
January 29, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to February 16, 2010 filed by Rave Wireless Inc. (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Rave Wireless Inc. answer due 2/16/2010). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 1/29/2010. (nms)
January 25, 2010 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to February 16, 2010 - filed by Rave Wireless Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 22, 2010 20 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Twitter Inc.. (Day, John)
January 22, 2010 19 ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand, and COUNTERCLAIM against Cooper Notification Inc., by Twitter Inc..(Day, John) Modified on 1/25/2010 (nms).
January 22, 2010 18 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Everbridge Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
January 22, 2010 17 ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Everbridge Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 1/25/2010 (nms).
January 14, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward A. Cavazos, Michael Chibib and Joshua L. Tucker filed by Everbridge Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 1/14/2010. (nms)
January 13, 2010 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward A. Cavazos, Michael Chibib and Joshua L. Tucker - filed by Everbridge Inc.. (Hatcher, Laura)
January 12, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney PAUL J. ANDRE, ESQ., LISA KOBIALKA, ESQ., JAMES HANNAH, ESQ. AND SEAN BOYLE, ESQ filed by Cooper Notification Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 1/12/2010. (nms)
January 12, 2010 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cooper Notification Inc.. Federal Signal Corporation served on 1/11/2010, answer due 2/1/2010. (Rovner, Philip)
January 11, 2010 Summons Issued as to Federal Signal Corporation on 1/11/2010. (rwc)
January 8, 2010 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Federal Signal Corporation- filed by Cooper Notification Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rovner, Philip)
January 4, 2010 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney PAUL J. ANDRE, ESQ., LISA KOBIALKA, ESQ., JAMES HANNAH, ESQ. AND SEAN BOYLE, ESQ - filed by Cooper Notification Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
December 9, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to January 11, 2010 filed by Twitter Inc., Cooper Notification Inc. (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Twitter Inc. answer due 1/11/2010). Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 12/9/2009. (nms)
December 8, 2009 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Cooper Notification Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cooper US Inc. for Cooper Notification Inc... (Rovner, Philip)
December 8, 2009 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Cottrell, III on behalf of Everbridge Inc. (Cottrell, Frederick)
December 7, 2009 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to January 11, 2010 - filed by Cooper Notification Inc., Twitter Inc.. (Day, John)
December 7, 2009 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Everbridge Inc.. (Hatcher, Laura)
December 7, 2009 8 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Everbridge Inc..(Hatcher, Laura)
December 4, 2009 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint or otherwise move to January 11, 2009 filed by Rave Wireless Inc.. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Rave Wireless Inc. answer due 1/11/2009. Signed by Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. on 12/4/2009. (nms)
December 3, 2009 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint or otherwise move to January 11, 2009 - filed by Rave Wireless Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 25, 2009 Case assigned to Judge Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. Please include the initials of the Judge (JJF) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 17, 2009 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cooper Notification Inc.. Rave Wireless Inc. served on 11/16/2009, answer due 12/7/2009. (Rovner, Philip)
November 17, 2009 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cooper Notification Inc.. Everbridge Inc. served on 11/16/2009, answer due 12/7/2009. (Rovner, Philip)
November 17, 2009 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cooper Notification Inc.. Twitter Inc. served on 11/16/2009, answer due 12/7/2009. (Rovner, Philip)
November 16, 2009 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,409,428 B1; (mxw,)
November 16, 2009 Summons Issued as to Rave Wireless Inc. on 11/16/2009. (mxw,)
November 16, 2009 Summons Issued as to Everbridge Inc. on 11/16/2009. (mxw,)
November 16, 2009 Summons Issued as to Twitter Inc. on 11/16/2009. (mxw,)
November 13, 2009 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (mxw, )
November 13, 2009 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Everbridge Inc., Rave Wireless Inc., Twitter Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 03110000000000656862.) - filed by Cooper Notification Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mxw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cooper Notification Inc. v. Twitter Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cooper Notification Inc.
Represented By: Philip A. Rovner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everbridge Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rave Wireless Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]