Dowd et al v. New Castle County Delaware

Plaintiff: Christine M. Dowd, Damon M. Morris and Roy I. Morris
Defendant: New Castle County Delaware
Case Number: 1:2010cv00082
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/21/2010. (nmf)
September 29, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 12/17/2010., Discovery Conference set for 11/1/2010 05:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2011.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/29/2010. (nmf)
April 13, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/13/2011. (nmf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowd et al v. New Castle County Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine M. Dowd
Represented By: Thomas C. Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon M. Morris
Represented By: Thomas C. Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy I. Morris
Represented By: Thomas C. Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Castle County Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.