Morris v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Christine Morris
Defendant: Michael Astrue
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00414
Filed: May 18, 2010
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
 
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2012 31 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the Court GRANT-IN-PART D.I. 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christine Morris, and DENY without prejudice D.I. 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Astrue, and VACATE the ALJ's decision and REMAND for further proceedings consitent with this opinion. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 3/26/2012. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/9/2012. (dlk)
April 4, 2012 32 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (CASE CLOSED); granting in part 14 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; the Administrative Law Judge's decision is VACATED and REMANDED for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/3/12. (ntl)
January 23, 2013 36 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 33 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Christine Morris. Defendant Michael Astrue, Commissioner of Social Security, shall pay attorney's fees in the amount of $8,262.00 and costs in the amount of $350.00 to Plaintiff Christine Morris. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 01/23/2013. (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Morris v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Morris
Represented By: Steven Loyd Butler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]