Shahin v. Delaware Federal Credit Union

Plaintiff: Nina Shahin
Defendant: Delaware Federal Credit Union
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00475
Filed: June 1, 2010
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2012 41 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/4/12. (dzb, )
September 19, 2013 54 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/19/13. (cla, )
March 7, 2014 64 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/6/14. (cla, )
May 15, 2014 73 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER re 66 MOTION for Reargument filed by Nina Shahin is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/15/14. (ntl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Shahin v. Delaware Federal Credit Union
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Shahin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Federal Credit Union
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]