Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Motorola Mobility Inc.

Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Defendant: Motorola Mobility Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00908
Filed: October 6, 2011
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2014 284 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/2/2014. (nmfn)
October 28, 2014 349 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/28/2014. (nmfn)
February 24, 2015 378 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/24/2015. (nmfn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Motorola Mobility Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Represented By: David L. Alberti
Represented By: Marc C. Belloli
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Day
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Ian N. Feinberg
Represented By: Sal Lim
Represented By: Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni
Represented By: Clayton Thompson
Represented By: Yakov Zolotorev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.