United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Hammerhead Distribution Incorporated v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Hammerhead Distribution Incorporated
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America, Commonwealth Construction Co. Inc., Best International Construction Co. Inc. and Kyu H. Park
Cross_claimant: Commonwealth Construction Co. Inc.
Cross_defendant: Best International Construction Co. Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01160
Filed: November 23, 2011
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- denying 21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Best International Construction Co. Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Obje ctions (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 3/4/2013. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/15/2013. (lih)
February 15, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- denying 35 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Kyu H. Park filed by Hammerhead Distribution Incorporated. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 3/4/2013. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/15/2013. (lih)
March 11, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; adopting 38 Report and Recommendations denying 21 Motion for Default Judgment without prejudice to renew upon resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings and termination of the automatic stay. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/11/2013. (nmfn)
March 11, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; re 39 Report and Recommendations denying 35 Motion for Default Judgment without prejudice to renew upon a showing that plaintiff's claim was not asserted and discharged in defendant Park's bankruptcy proceeding. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/11/2013. (nmfn)
May 3, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- Recommending that the court administratively close the present action pursuant to Title 11 of the United States Code, Section 362, pending resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings, termination of the automatic stay, and to the extent such claims against each defendant have not been adjudicated and/or discharged in the bankruptcy proceedings. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of t he Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 5/20/2013. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/3/2013. (lih)
May 30, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 42 administratively closing this action. (CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/30/2013. (nmfn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Hammerhead Distribution Incorporated v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hammerhead Distribution Incorporated
Represented By: Jonathan M. Stemerman
Represented By: Theodore Allan Kittila
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Victoria Kathryn Petrone
Represented By: Donald L. Logan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Construction Co. Inc.
Represented By: Donald L. Logan
Represented By: Victoria Kathryn Petrone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best International Construction Co. Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyu H. Park
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Commonwealth Construction Co. Inc.
Represented By: Donald L. Logan
Represented By: Victoria Kathryn Petrone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Best International Construction Co. Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]