Hegedus et al v. Ross et al

Plaintiff: James A. Hegedus and Virginia Hegedus
Defendant: Robert L. Ross, Oneida Sandra Ross and Carl A. Spangler
Case Number: 1:2012cv00025
Filed: January 12, 2012
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Oneida Sandra Ross, Robert L. Ross, 6 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon 1) statute of limitations; 2) failure to state a claim; 3) res judicata; and 4) collateral estoppel filed by Carl A. Spangler. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 7/30/2012. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/12/2012. (cak)
August 13, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 17 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/13/2012. (rpg)
September 20, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying 21 MOTION to Vacate 20 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation filed by James A. Hegedus, Virginia Hegedus. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/20/12. (ntl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hegedus et al v. Ross et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Hegedus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Hegedus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Ross
Represented By: Josiah Rodney Wolcott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneida Sandra Ross
Represented By: Josiah Rodney Wolcott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl A. Spangler
Represented By: William J. Rhodunda, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]