Immersion Corporation v. HTC Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Immersion Corporation
Defendant: HTC Corporation, HTC (BVI) Corporation, HTC America Holdings Inc., Exedea Inc. and HTC America Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00259
Filed: March 2, 2012
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2014 225 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 182 MOTION to Compel Further Discovery Regarding the Royalty Analysis for the Patents-in-Suit Performed by Stout Risius Ross (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/7/2014. (nms)
February 11, 2015 332 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION providing construction for the claim terms in dispute. The parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury (see Memorandum Opinion for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/11/2015. (nms)
February 11, 2015 333 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Motions for Summary Judgment (see D.I. 233 , 239 , 242 , and 245 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/11/2015. (nms)
February 24, 2015 342 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of James Pampinella (D.I. 236 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/24/2015. (nms)
January 21, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part a discovery dispute between the parties (see 95 Letter, 94 Letter). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/21/2014. (nms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Immersion Corporation v. HTC Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immersion Corporation
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Richard D. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC (BVI) Corporation
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Holdings Inc.
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exedea Inc.
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Inc.
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]