Hanzer v. Mentor Network

Plaintiff: Mirium Hanzer
Defendant: Mentor Network
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00363
Filed: March 21, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mary Pat Thynge
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 101 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mentor Network. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longe r than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 4/28/2014. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/10/14. (cak)
September 30, 2014 127 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 112 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ADOPTED; 101 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mentor Network is GRANTED; ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/30/14. (ntl)
July 30, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 20 MOTION to Strike filed by Mentor Network. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 8/16/2012. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/30/2012. (cak)
September 20, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: adopting 29 Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/20/12. (ntl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hanzer v. Mentor Network
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirium Hanzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentor Network
Represented By: Jami B. Nimeroff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]