Glaser v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Defendant: Google Inc.
Plaintiff: Bert Glaser
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00667
Filed: May 29, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2511
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2012 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:12-md-02358-SLR. (nmfn)
July 27, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Stipulation Consolidating Cases for All Purposes. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/27/2012. (nmfn)
July 25, 2012 7 Joint STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE INDIVIDUAL CIVIL ACTIONS AND SUBSEQUENT TAG-ALONG ACTIONS by Google Inc.. (Weibell, Anthony)
July 25, 2012 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Weibell on behalf of Google, Inc., Google Inc., Google Inc., Google Inc., Google, Inc., Google Inc., Google Inc, Google, Inc. (Weibell, Anthony)
July 5, 2012 5 Order Setting In-Person Status and Scheduling Conference: An In-Person Status and Scheduling Conference is set for 10/24/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/5/2012. (nmfn)
June 8, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 4 MOTION to Stay Stipulated Request for Order Staying Case Pending JPML filed by Bert Glaser, Case stayed.. (See D.I. 4 for further details). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/8/2012. (fms)
June 7, 2012 4 MOTION to Stay Stipulated Request for Order Staying Case Pending JPML - filed by Bert Glaser. (Straite, David)
June 6, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 4, 2012 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bert Glaser. Google Inc. served on 6/4/2012, answer due 6/25/2012. (Straite, David)
May 29, 2012 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Google Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 0311-1081616.) - filed by Bert Glaser. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Glaser v. Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bert Glaser
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]