Villegas v. Google, Inc et al Featured Case

Defendant: Google, Inc. and Pointroll, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lourdes Villegas
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00739
Filed: June 15, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (els)
June 15, 2012 35 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (els)
June 15, 2012 34 Record of case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number in Other District: 5:12-cv-00915. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 13, 2012 33 MDL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring the case Villegas -. Google, Inc. (C.A. 12-cv-00915) from the Northern District of California to the District of Delaware to become part of MDL 2358. (Attachments: # 1 MDL 2358 Certified Transfer Order)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
June 12, 2012 32 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Notice of MDL Transfer Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 6/12/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
June 11, 2012 31 Featured Case ORDER Administratively Closing File While Case Is Stayed; Order Vacating Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/11/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
April 3, 2012 30 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 29 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
April 2, 2012 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Time for Defendant PointRoll, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by Pointroll, Inc., Lourdes Villegas. (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 4/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 28, 2012 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lourdes Villegas. Pointroll, Inc. served on 3/7/2012, answer due 3/28/2012. PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE RE DEFENDANT POINTROLL, INC. (Strange, Brian) (Filed on 3/28/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 26, 2012 27 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 26, 2012 26 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 20, 2012 23 Order Granting Stipulation 18 to Extend Time for Defendant Pointroll, Inc. to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/20/3012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012) Modified text on 3/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 20, 2012 22 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 16 Stipulated Request for an Order Granting a Stay.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012) Modified text on 3/21/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 20, 2012 21 STIPULATION re 9 Summons Returned Executed, 1 Complaint, Stipulation Extending Google's Time to Respond filed by Google, Inc.. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 3/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 19, 2012 25 Proposed Order re 24 APPLICATION of Edward R. McNicholas for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 54611011532) Filing fee paid on 3/19/2012 by Pointroll, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012) (dhm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 19, 2012 24 APPLICATION of Edward R. McNicholas for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 54611011532) Filing fee paid on 3/19/2012 filed by Pointroll, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012) (dhm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 19, 2012 20 Proposed Order re 19 MOTION for Attorney Alan C. Raul for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305.00, receipt number 54611011530.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/19/2012 by Pointroll, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 19, 2012 19 MOTION for Attorney Alan C. Raul for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305.00, receipt number 54611011530.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/19/2012 filed by Pointroll, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 19, 2012 18 Proposed Order re 15 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant PointRoll, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by Pointroll, Inc.. (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 3/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 19, 2012 17 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 16, 2012 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request for an Order Granting a Stay and [Proposed] Order filed by Google, Inc.. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 3/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 16, 2012 15 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant PointRoll, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by Pointroll, Inc., Lourdes Villegas. (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 3/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 16, 2012 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Google, Inc.. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 3/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 16, 2012 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Maura Lea Rees (Rees, Maura) (Filed on 3/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 16, 2012 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo Patrick Cunningham for Google Inc. (Cunningham, Leo) (Filed on 3/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 16, 2012 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Kramer for Google Inc. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 3/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 16, 2012 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Rubin for Google Inc. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 3/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 16, 2012 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lourdes Villegas. Google, Inc. served on 2/29/2012, answer due 3/21/2012. Proof of Personal Service on Google Inc. (Strange, Brian) (Filed on 3/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 14, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 3/14/2012. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 13, 2012 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: 5/22/2012 Case Management Conference is hereby vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 12, 2012 6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Google, Inc., Pointroll, Inc. (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 3/12/2012) Modified on 3/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
March 12, 2012 5 NOTICE of Appearance by PointRoll, Inc (Thompson, Carol) (Filed on 3/12/2012) Modified on 3/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/16/2012 counsel selected incorrect party filer information (dhm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
February 23, 2012 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/15/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
February 23, 2012 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
February 23, 2012 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Lourdes Villegas (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]
February 23, 2012 1 Alleged Class Action Complaint (Summons Issued); jury demand; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611011385.). Filed by Lourdes Villegas. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2012: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/15/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Villegas v. Google, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Leo Patrick Cunningham
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pointroll, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Morrison Coletti
Represented By: Carol Lynn Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lourdes Villegas
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Represented By: Joseph H. Malley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]