Kreisman v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Karin Kreisman
Defendant: Google Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00741
Filed: June 14, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (dzs, )
June 14, 2012 17 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (dzs, )
June 14, 2012 16 Record of case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number in Other District: 1:12-cv-01470. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 13, 2012 15 TRANSFERRED to the U.S.D.C. District of Delaware the electronic record. (lp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
June 13, 2012 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to the U.S.D.C. of Delaware.(lp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
May 4, 2012 13 MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Status hearing held on 5/4/2012. Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice by Michael Rubin 11 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/29/2012 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (ca, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
May 3, 2012 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google, Inc. by Aric Seth Jacover (Jacover, Aric) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
May 1, 2012 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7104991. (Rubin, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
April 11, 2012 10 NOTICE by Aron David Robinson of Change of Address (Robinson, Aron) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
March 13, 2012 9 MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Joint motion for a stay of proceedings pending ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict litigation 7 is granted. Status hearing set for 5/4/2012 at 09:30 AM. No appearance is required on 3/15/12 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
March 9, 2012 8 NOTICE of Motion by Blake Anthony Strautins for presentment of motion to stay 7 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/15/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Strautins, Blake) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
March 9, 2012 7 MOTION by Defendant Google, Inc., Plaintiff Karin Kreisman to stay Proceedings Pending Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Strautins, Blake) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
March 2, 2012 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Karin Kreisman by Sharon Harris (Harris, Sharon) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
March 1, 2012 6 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/1/2012.(lp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
March 1, 2012 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable George M. Marovich. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Martin C. Ashman. (nsf, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
March 1, 2012 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Karin Kreisman by Blake Anthony Strautins (Strautins, Blake) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
March 1, 2012 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Karin Kreisman by Ben Barnow (Barnow, Ben) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
March 1, 2012 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Barnow, Ben) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]
March 1, 2012 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint filed by Karin Kreisman; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6892747.(Barnow, Ben) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/14/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kreisman v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karin Kreisman
Represented By: Sharon Harris
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Blake Anthony Strautins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Aric Seth Jacover
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]