Rischar v. Google, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: James Henry Rischar
Defendant: Google Inc. and Does 1 through 10
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00742
Filed: June 14, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (dzs, )
June 14, 2012 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (dzs, )
June 14, 2012 7 Record of case transferred in from District of Kansas; Case Number in Other District: 2:12-cv-02100. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 13, 2012 6 TRANSFER ORDER. Case electronically transferred to the District of Delaware (MDL-2358). ***Terminating Case. (mm) [Transferred from Kansas on 6/14/2012.]
June 12, 2012 5 MINUTE ORDER -- TO THE TRANSFEROR JUDGES/CLERKS OF THE ASSOCIATED CASES: This transmittal is for informational purposes only. No action is required at this time.A transfer order has been filed today in this litigation. Rule 2.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, states...An order to transfer or remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 shall be effective only upon its filing with the clerk of the transferee district court.You will receive a certified copy of this order from the transferee court along with notification of the newly assigned case number(s) in that district. With the advent of electronic filing, Rule 9.1 of the Panel Rules shall be satisfied upon transmittal of the portion of the file deemed necessary and requested by the transferee court.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 6/12/2012.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2358, CAN/5:12-cv-00915, DE/1:12-cv-00200, FLS/1:12-cv-20842, ILN/1:12-cv-01470, KS/2:12-cv-02100, MOW/2:12-cv-00222, MSN/3:12-cv-00023, NJ/2:12-cv-00983 (TB). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ck) [Transferred from Kansas on 6/14/2012.]
March 27, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER granting as unopposed 3 Motion to Stay Case pending a ruling by the MDL panel. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 3/27/2012. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jw) [Transferred from Kansas on 6/14/2012.]
March 15, 2012 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Case Pending Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Plaintiff James Henry Rischar(Gorny, Stephen) [Transferred from Kansas on 6/14/2012.]
February 23, 2012 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google, Inc. Summons emailed to Attorney for service. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta) [Transferred from Kansas on 6/14/2012.]
February 21, 2012 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $350.00, receipt number K4631032008. (ta) [Transferred from Kansas on 6/14/2012.]
February 20, 2012 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re 1 Complaint by Plaintiff James Henry Rischar. (ta) [Transferred from Kansas on 6/14/2012.]
February 20, 2012 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by James Henry Rischar.(ta) [Transferred from Kansas on 6/14/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rischar v. Google, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Henry Rischar
Represented By: Stephen M. Gorny
Represented By: Michelle L. Marvel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]