Movitz v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Defendant: Google, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alex Movitz
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00743
Filed: June 14, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2511
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (els)
June 14, 2012 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (els)
June 14, 2012 6 Record of case transferred in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number in Other District: 3:12-cv-00023. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 13, 2012 5 Case Transferred to District of Delaware. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (jtm) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 6/14/2012.]
March 22, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion to Stay. Signed by S. Allan Alexander on 3/22/2012. (kbt) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 6/14/2012.]
March 14, 2012 3 MOTION to Stay by All Plaintiffs. (Shelton, David) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 6/14/2012.]
February 28, 2012 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P. Mills and Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander. (tab) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 6/14/2012.]
February 27, 2012 2 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc. (tab) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 6/14/2012.]
February 27, 2012 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 350, receipt number MSN300007487, filed by Alex Movitz. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 6/14/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Movitz v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Movitz
Represented By: David Shelton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]