Yngelmo v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Defendant: Google Inc.
Plaintiff: Ana Yngelmo
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00745
Filed: June 15, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (dzs, )
June 15, 2012 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (dzs, )
June 15, 2012 10 Record of case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number in Other District: 2:12-cv-00983. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 12, 2012 9 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Delaware. (ma) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2012.]
May 24, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William H. Murphy, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/24/12. (dc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2012.]
May 23, 2012 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ANA YNGELMO. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Barry Eichen, # 2 Declaration William Murphy, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(EICHEN, BARRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2012.]
April 12, 2012 6 NOTICE of Appearance by TONIA O. KLAUSNER on behalf of GOOGLE INC. (KLAUSNER, TONIA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2012.]
March 12, 2012 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/2/12. (dc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2012.]
March 9, 2012 4 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling By Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation by ANA YNGELMO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(EICHEN, BARRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2012.]
March 2, 2012 3 APPLICATION/PETITION for Transfer to MDL Panel for by GOOGLE INC. (tjg,) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2012.]
February 22, 2012 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GOOGLE INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *LEROY DUNBAR* (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2012.]
February 17, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against GOOGLE INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4192383.) JURY DEMAND., filed by ANA YNGELMO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Yngelmo v. Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Tonia O. Klausner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Yngelmo
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Represented By: Barry R. Eichen
Represented By: Thomas Paciorkowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]