Heinrich v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Nicholas Todd Heinrich
Defendant: Google, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00792
Filed: June 25, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2511
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER granting Stipulation Consolidating Cases for All Purposes (13 in 1:12-cv-00744-SLR, 14 in 1:12-cv-00798-SLR, 14 in 1:12-cv-00796-SLR, 15 in 1:12-cv-00792-SLR, 12 in 1:12-cv-00790-SLR, 11 in 1:12-cv-00200-SLR, 14 in 1:12-cv-00789-SLR, 42 in 1:12-cv-00739-SLR, 12 in 1:12-cv-00793-SLR, 13 in 1:12-cv-00794-SLR, 12 in 1:12-cv-00742-SLR, 13 in 1:12-cv-00800-SLR, 11 in 1:12-cv-00795-SLR, 15 in 1:12-cv-00745-SLR, 13 in 1:12-cv-00799-SLR, 11 in 1:12-cv-00743-SLR, 19 in 1:12-md-02358-SLR, 13 in 1:12-cv-00740-SLR, 13 in 1:12-cv-00797-SLR, 19 in 1:12-cv-00791-SLR, 21 in 1:12-cv-00741-SLR, 6 in 1:12-cv-00962-SLR) SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02358-SLR et al.(nmfn)
July 25, 2012 15 Joint STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE INDIVIDUAL CIVIL ACTIONS AND SUBSEQUENT TAG-ALONG ACTIONS by Google Inc.. (Weibell, Anthony)
July 25, 2012 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Weibell on behalf of Google, Inc., Google Inc., Google Inc., Google Inc., Google, Inc., Google Inc., Google Inc, Google, Inc. (Weibell, Anthony)
July 3, 2012 13 Order Setting In-Person Status and Scheduling Conference: An In-Person Status and Scheduling Conference is set for 10/24/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/3/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02358-SLR et al.(nmfn)
June 25, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (els)
June 25, 2012 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (els)
June 25, 2012 11 Record of case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number in Other District: 1:12-cv-01821. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 25, 2012 10 TRANSFERRED to the District of Delaware the electronic record. (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/25/2012.]
June 25, 2012 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to District of Delaware. (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/25/2012.]
April 18, 2012 8 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:This stayed lawsuit is hereby administratively dismissed without prejudice with full leave to reinstate upon the completion of the consolidated MDL proceedings.Mailed notice (rao, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/25/2012.]
March 30, 2012 7 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:Plaintiff's joint motion for a stay of proceedings pending ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation 6 is granted. All proceedings and deadlines are stayed until 45 days after the JPML rules on the MDL motion, or until 45 days after a JPML Conditional Transfer Order is entered. The date for the defendant to answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint is stayed. Any obligations of the parties to meet and confer regarding initial disclosures, including under FRCP 26(f), are stayed.Mailed notice (rao, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/25/2012.]
March 22, 2012 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Nicholas Todd Heinrich to stay Joint Motion for a Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Staying Proceedings Pending Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation)(Wylie, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/25/2012.]
March 13, 2012 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Morton Denlow. (daj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/25/2012.]
March 13, 2012 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nicholas Todd Heinrich by Charles Robert Watkins (Watkins, Charles) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/25/2012.]
March 13, 2012 4 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Google, Inc. on 3/13/12 by Plaintiff Nicholas Todd Heinrich. (Attachments: # 1 Waiver of Service)(Wylie, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/25/2012.]
March 13, 2012 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nicholas Todd Heinrich by John R. Wylie (Wylie, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/25/2012.]
March 13, 2012 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wylie, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/25/2012.]
March 13, 2012 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nicholas Todd Heinrich; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6934410.(Wylie, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/25/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Heinrich v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Todd Heinrich
Represented By: Charles Robert Watkins
Represented By: John R. Wylie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]