Musgrove v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Michael Musgrove
Defendant: Google, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00795
Filed: June 22, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2511
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (rwc)
June 25, 2012 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (rwc)
June 25, 2012 7 Record of case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number in Other District: 8:12-cv-00698. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 25, 2012 6 Featured Case MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-1). Signed by Judge Maryland Unassigned on 6/22/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Transfer Letter)(rss, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 6/25/2012.]
March 20, 2012 5 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 3 Joint Motion for a Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; STAYING all proceedings and deadlines in this case and directing the Clerk of the Court to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/15/2012. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m D. Kramer & M. Rubin 3/20/12) [Transferred from Maryland on 6/25/2012.]
March 14, 2012 3 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling by JPML by Michael Musgrove Responses due by 4/2/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tycko, Jonathan) [Transferred from Maryland on 6/25/2012.]
March 12, 2012 4 NOTICE of Related Actions by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Related Actions, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(rss, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 6/25/2012.]
March 8, 2012 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Google, Inc. (kns, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 6/25/2012.]
March 5, 2012 Jury Trial Demand by Michael Musgrove. (kns, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 6/25/2012.]
March 5, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0416-3395670.), filed by Michael Musgrove. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Tycko, Jonathan) [Transferred from Maryland on 6/25/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Musgrove v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Musgrove
Represented By: Jonathan K Tycko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]