Landrum v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Stephen D. Landrum
Defendant: Google, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00962
Filed: July 23, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (rwc)
July 23, 2012 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (rwc)
July 23, 2012 3 Record of case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number in Other District: 6:12-cv-02389. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
July 20, 2012 2 Featured Case ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Delaware for inclusion in MDL 2358. (SPT ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/23/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 350, receipt_number 1126-1704885(B4601035132). related document 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Google, Inc. filed by Stephen D. Landrum; request for service by certified mail included in complaint.(SPT ). (Crocker, R.) Modified on 7/11/2012 (SPT ). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/23/2012.]
July 3, 2012 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Google, Inc. filed by Stephen D. Landrum; request for service by certified mail included in complaint.(SPT ) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/23/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Landrum v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen D. Landrum
Represented By: R. Champ Crocker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. Weibell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]