Nobles v. Google, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Zetha Nobles
Defendant: Google, Inc. and Pointroll, Inc.
Movant: Ana Yngelmo, James Henry Rischar, Lourdes Villegas, Matthew Soble, Bert Glaser, Larry Sossin, Lynne Krause, Brian Martorana, William G. Gourley, Kenneth W. Heretick, Alex Movitz, Franchise Dynamics LLC, Stephen D. Landrum, Nicholas Todd Heinrich and Jacqueline Burdick
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01000
Filed: July 31, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER granting Stipulation Consolidating Cases for All Purposes. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/27/2012. (nmfn)
August 1, 2012 Set Hearings: An In-Person Status and Scheduling Conference is set for 10/24/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. See order of 7/3/12(D.I. 12) in 12-md-2358-SLR. (nmf)
August 1, 2012 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (rwc)
August 1, 2012 6 Record of case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number in Other District: 3:12-cv-03589. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
July 31, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (rwc)
July 27, 2012 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1), TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of Delaware. In re: Google Inc. Cookie Placement Consumer Privacy Litigation. MDL No. 2358 (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/1/2012.]
July 24, 2012 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Weibell ; Leo P. Cunningham; and Michael H. Rubin (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 7/24/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/1/2012.]
July 10, 2012 3 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc., Pointroll, Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012) (far, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/1/2012.]
July 10, 2012 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/1/2012.]
July 10, 2012 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., Pointroll, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611009082). DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filed byZetha Nobles. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2012: # 1 part two, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (far, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/1/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nobles v. Google, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zetha Nobles
Represented By: Reginald Von Terrell
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J Weibell
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Represented By: Leo Patrick Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pointroll, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Ana Yngelmo
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: James Henry Rischar
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Lourdes Villegas
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Matthew Soble
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Bert Glaser
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Larry Sossin
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Lynne Krause
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Brian Martorana
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: William G. Gourley
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Kenneth W. Heretick
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Alex Movitz
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Franchise Dynamics LLC
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Stephen D. Landrum
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Nicholas Todd Heinrich
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Jacqueline Burdick
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]