Arendi S.A.R.L. v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Arendi S.A.R.L.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01596
Filed: November 29, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (48 in 1:12-cv-01598-LPS, 45 in 1:12-cv-01599-LPS, 53 in 1:12-cv-01596-LPS, 46 in 1:12-cv-01600-LPS, 38 in 1:13-cv-00920-LPS, 50 in 1:12-cv-01602-LPS, 45 in 1:12-cv-01595-LPS, 44 in 1:12-cv-01597-LPS, 35 in 1:13-cv-00919-LPS, 49 in 1:12-cv-01601-LPS) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY THE CASE -- Case Stayed. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/26/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al. (ntl)
February 27, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (48 in 1:12-cv-01601-LPS, 43 in 1:12-cv-01597-LPS, 44 in 1:12-cv-01595-LPS, 44 in 1:12-cv-01599-LPS, 52 in 1:12-cv-01596-LPS, 49 in 1:12-cv-01602-LPS, 45 in 1:12-cv-01600-LPS, 47 in 1:12-cv-01598-LPS, 37 in 1:13-cv-00920-LPS, 34 in 1:13-cv-00919-LPS) Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Parties' Deadline to Exchange Certain Claim Terms and Phrases to February 28, 2014. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/26/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al.(ntl)
February 24, 2014 53 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order To Stay The Case by Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, Motorola Mobility LLC, Google Inc., Apple Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corp., Yahoo! Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Kraft, Denise)
February 21, 2014 52 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Parties' Deadline to Exchange Certain Claim Terms and Phrases to February 28, 2014 - filed by Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, Motorola Mobility LLC, Google Inc., Apple Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc., Yahoo! Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corp., Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Kraft, Denise)
February 21, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (43 in 1:12-cv-01595-LPS, 47 in 1:12-cv-01601-LPS, 51 in 1:12-cv-01596-LPS, 48 in 1:12-cv-01602-LPS, 46 in 1:12-cv-01598-LPS, 42 in 1:12-cv-01597-LPS, 44 in 1:12-cv-01600-LPS, 36 in 1:13-cv-00920-LPS, 43 in 1:12-cv-01599-LPS, 33 in 1:13-cv-00919-LPS) Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Parties' deadline to Exchange Certain Claim Terms and Phrases to February 21, 2014. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/21/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al. (ntl)
February 13, 2014 51 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Parties' deadline to Exchange Certain Claim Terms and Phrases to February 21, 2014 - filed by Blackberry Corporation, Blackberry Limited, Motorola Mobility LLC, Google Inc., Apple Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc., Yahoo! Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corp., Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Kraft, Denise)
January 17, 2014 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Biggs, Brian)
January 13, 2014 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-94) and Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-4) re 47 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Discovery Requests to January 10, 2014, 44 Notice of Service filed by Arendi S.A.R.L..(Belgam, Neal)
December 10, 2013 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Arendi S.A.R.L's Section 4(A) Disclosures by Arendi S.A.R.L..(Belgam, Neal)
December 10, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 47 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Discovery Requests to January 10, 2014 filed by Arendi S.A.R.L. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/10/13. (ntl)
December 9, 2013 47 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Discovery Requests to January 10, 2014 - filed by Arendi S.A.R.L.. (Belgam, Neal)
December 5, 2013 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses To First Set of Joint Requests For Production of Documents (Nos. 1-58) and Second Set of Joint Interrogatories (Nos. 3-6) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Biggs, Brian)
December 2, 2013 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Core Technical Document Production APL-ARENDI 000001-357074 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Biggs, Brian)
November 7, 2013 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Apple Inc.'s: 1) First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (1-94), and 2) First Set of Interrogatories to Arendi S.A.R.L. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise)
November 4, 2013 43 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Aleine M. Porterfield by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Biggs, Brian)
November 4, 2013 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Arendi S.A.R.L.'s Section 3 Disclosures by Arendi S.A.R.L..(Belgam, Neal)
November 1, 2013 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Paragraph 3 Initial Disclosures Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("E-Discovery") by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Biggs, Brian)
October 29, 2013 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Joint Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants (Nos. 1-58) and Plaintiff's Second Set of Joint Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 3-6) by Arendi S.A.R.L..(Belgam, Neal)
October 25, 2013 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Biggs on behalf of Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Biggs, Brian)
October 24, 2013 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Arendi S.A.R.L's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories re (33 in 1:12-cv-01602-LPS, 32 in 1:12-cv-01600-LPS, 31 in 1:12-cv-01595-LPS, 19 in 1:13-cv-00920-LPS, 30 in 1:12-cv-01601-LPS, 33 in 1:12-cv-01598-LPS, 33 in 1:12-cv-01597-LPS, 18 in 1:13-cv-00919-LPS, 32 in 1:12-cv-01596-LPS, 29 in 1:12-cv-01599-LPS) Notice of Service,, by Arendi S.A.R.L.. Related document: (33 in 1:12-cv-01602-LPS, 32 in 1:12-cv-01600-LPS, 31 in 1:12-cv-01595-LPS, 19 in 1:13-cv-00920-LPS, 30 in 1:12-cv-01601-LPS, 33 in 1:12-cv-01598-LPS, 33 in 1:12-cv-01597-LPS, 18 in 1:13-cv-00919-LPS, 32 in 1:12-cv-01596-LPS, 29 in 1:12-cv-01599-LPS) Notice of Service,, filed by Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Google Inc., Sony Corporation, Apple Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Yahoo! Inc., Blackberry Limited, LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., HTC Corp., Motorola Mobility LLC.(Belgam, Neal)
October 21, 2013 37 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: 35 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND Apple Inc.'s Answer To Arendi S.A.R.L.'s First Amended Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise)
October 4, 2013 36 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,323,853; . (Belgam, Neal)
October 3, 2013 35 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc.- filed by Arendi S.A.R.L.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Belgam, Neal)
October 2, 2013 34 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Arendi S.A.R.L.: Entry of appearance of attorney Neal C. Belgam. Attorney Proctor Heyman LLP terminated. (Belgam, Neal)
September 25, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (20 in 1:13-cv-00920-LPS, 34 in 1:12-cv-01598-LPS, 34 in 1:12-cv-01602-LPS, 30 in 1:12-cv-01599-LPS, 32 in 1:12-cv-01595-LPS, 33 in 1:12-cv-01596-LPS, 32 in 1:12-cv-01601-LPS) Stipulation for Filing Amended Complaints and for Limiting Asserted Claims. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/25/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al.(ntl)
September 24, 2013 33 STIPULATION for Filing Amended Complaints and for Limiting Asserted Claims by Arendi S.A.R.L.. (Belgam, Neal)
September 20, 2013 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Arendi S.A.R.L. (Nos. 1-9) by Blackberry Limited, Motorola Mobility LLC, Google Inc., Apple Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corp., Yahoo! Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Porterfield, Aleine)
September 11, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (29 in 1:12-cv-01601-LPS, 31 in 1:12-cv-01600-LPS, 31 in 1:12-cv-01596-LPS, 32 in 1:12-cv-01597-LPS, 30 in 1:12-cv-01595-LPS, 16 in 1:13-cv-00919-LPS, 28 in 1:12-cv-01599-LPS, 32 in 1:12-cv-01602-LPS, 32 in 1:12-cv-01598-LPS, 17 in 1:13-cv-00920-LPS) AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/11/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al.(ntl)
September 10, 2013 31 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Neal C. Belgam regarding Jointly Submitted Form of Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Agreed Protective Order)(Belgam, Neal)
September 9, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (27 in 1:12-cv-01599-LPS, 30 in 1:12-cv-01597-LPS, 31 in 1:12-cv-01602-LPS, 30 in 1:12-cv-01600-LPS, 28 in 1:12-cv-01601-LPS, 16 in 1:13-cv-00920-LPS, 31 in 1:12-cv-01598-LPS, 15 in 1:13-cv-00919-LPS, 29 in 1:12-cv-01595-LPS, 30 in 1:12-cv-01596-LPS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Protective Order to September 10, 2013 filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/9/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al.(ntl)
September 6, 2013 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Protective Order to September 10, 2013 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Kraft, Denise)
September 5, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (29 in 1:12-cv-01598-LPS, 28 in 1:12-cv-01596-LPS, 25 in 1:12-cv-01599-LPS, 13 in 1:13-cv-00919-LPS, 28 in 1:12-cv-01597-LPS, 26 in 1:12-cv-01601-LPS, 27 in 1:12-cv-01595-LPS, 28 in 1:12-cv-01600-LPS, 29 in 1:12-cv-01602-LPS, 14 in 1:13-cv-00920-LPS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File a Protective Order to September 6, 2013. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/5/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al.(ntl)
September 3, 2013 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Section 4(A) Disclosures by Arendi S.A.R.L..(Belgam, Neal)
August 30, 2013 28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File a Protective Order to September 6, 2013 - filed by Arendi S.A.R.L., Research In Motion Limited, Research in Motion Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Google Inc., Apple Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc., Yahoo! Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corp., Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Kraft, Denise)
August 16, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (24 in 1:12-cv-01599-LPS, 25 in 1:12-cv-01601-LPS, 27 in 1:12-cv-01596-LPS, 13 in 1:13-cv-00920-LPS, 26 in 1:12-cv-01595-LPS, 11 in 1:13-cv-00919-LPS, 27 in 1:12-cv-01597-LPS, 27 in 1:12-cv-01600-LPS, 28 in 1:12-cv-01602-LPS, 27 in 1:12-cv-01598-LPS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File a Protective Order to August 30, 2013. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/16/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al.(ntl)
August 15, 2013 27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File a Protective Order to August 30, 2013 - filed by Arendi S.A.R.L., Research In Motion Limited, Research in Motion Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Google Inc., Apple Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc., Yahoo! Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corp., Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Kraft, Denise)
August 1, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Seth Ard for Arendi S.A.R.L. added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01598-LPS et al.(dmp, )
July 17, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 9/9/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/17/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al.(dlk)
July 15, 2013 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Apple Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise)
July 12, 2013 24 Featured Case JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 2/4/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2014. Discovery due by 8/8/2014. Status Report due by 3/21/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2015. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 4/18/2014. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 5/16/2014. A Markman Hearing is set for 7/11/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/12/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al. (ntl)
July 10, 2013 23 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order by Arendi S.A.R.L., Research In Motion Limited, Research in Motion Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Google Inc., Apple Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corp., Yahoo! Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu)
July 9, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (22 in 1:12-cv-01600-LPS, 19 in 1:12-cv-01599-LPS, 6 in 1:13-cv-00919-LPS, 20 in 1:12-cv-01595-LPS, 21 in 1:12-cv-01597-LPS, 7 in 1:13-cv-00920-LPS, 21 in 1:12-cv-01598-LPS, 23 in 1:12-cv-01602-LPS, 22 in 1:12-cv-01596-LPS, 20 in 1:12-cv-01601-LPS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file a Protective Order to August 16, 2013. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/9/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al.(ntl)
July 8, 2013 22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file a Protective Order to August 16, 2013 - filed by Research In Motion Limited, Research in Motion Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Google Inc., Apple Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc., Yahoo! Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corp., Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
June 28, 2013 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Apple Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise)
June 28, 2013 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 (a)(1) by Arendi S.A.R.L..(Belgam, Neal)
June 12, 2013 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service of First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants by Arendi S.A.R.L..(Crompton, Dawn)
June 11, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brent K. Yamashita for Apple Inc. added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
June 7, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for Mediation. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al.(dlk)
June 7, 2013 18 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 11/4/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 11/4/2013. Discovery due by 5/9/2014. Status Report due by 12/20/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 10/24/2014. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 1/17/2014. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 2/14/2014. A Markman Hearing is set for 3/7/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/5/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al. (ntl)
May 28, 2013 17 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Neal C. Belgam regarding Jointly Submitted Proposed Case Scheduling Order. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Case Scheduling Order)(Belgam, Neal)
May 28, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brent K. Yamashita filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/28/13. (ntl)
May 24, 2013 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brent K. Yamashita - filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Counsel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Porterfield, Aleine)
May 22, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (16 in 1:12-cv-01602-LPS, 14 in 1:12-cv-01597-LPS, 12 in 1:12-cv-01601-LPS, 13 in 1:12-cv-01599-LPS, 14 in 1:12-cv-01595-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01600-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01596-LPS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01598-LPS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a proposed Scheduling Order to May 28, 2013. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/21/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al.(ntl)
May 17, 2013 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a proposed Scheduling Order to May 28, 2013 - filed by Arendi S.A.R.L., Research In Motion Limited, Research in Motion Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Apple Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc., Exedea Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corp., Samsung Electronics America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
April 30, 2013 14 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal to the Court no later than May 20, 2013. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, Forms). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/30/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al.(ntl)
January 29, 2013 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise)
January 29, 2013 12 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Apple Inc.'s Answer to Arendi S.A.R.L.'s Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise)
January 17, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Summer Krause,Mark D. Fowler,Kevin C. Hamilton for Apple Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
January 17, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert C. Williams,Christine K. Corbett for Apple Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
January 14, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark D. Fowler, Attorney Christine K. Corbett, and Attorney Summer Krause filed by Apple Inc., 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert C. Williams and Attorney Kevin C. Hamilton filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/14/13. (ntl)
January 11, 2013 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert C. Williams and Attorney Kevin C. Hamilton - filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Robert C. Williams, # 2 Certification of Kevin C. Hamilton, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise)
January 11, 2013 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark D. Fowler, Attorney Christine K. Corbett, and Attorney Summer Krause - filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Mark D. Fowler, # 2 Certification of Christine K. Corbett, # 3 Certification of Summer Krause, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise)
January 2, 2013 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Aleine Michelle Porterfield on behalf of Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Porterfield, Aleine)
January 2, 2013 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Seastone Kraft on behalf of Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise)
December 21, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Apple Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 29, 2013 filed by Apple Inc., Arendi S.A.R.L. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/21/12. (ntl)
December 19, 2012 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Apple Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 29, 2013 - filed by Apple Inc., Arendi S.A.R.L.. (Belgam, Neal)
December 12, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stephen D. Susman,Harry P. Susman for Arendi S.A.R.L. added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al.(dmp, )
December 12, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: Filed date of D.I. 3 Patent Report corrected. (dzb, )
December 11, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexandra White for Arendi S.A.R.L. added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01595-LPS et al.(els)
December 10, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen D. Susman, Harry P. Susman, Alexandra G. White and Seth Ard filed by Arendi S.A.R.L. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/10/12. (ntl)
December 7, 2012 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen D. Susman, Harry P. Susman, Alexandra G. White and Seth Ard - filed by Arendi S.A.R.L.. (Belgam, Neal)
December 5, 2012 Cases Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: CA 12-1595 through CA 12-1602.(bkb)
December 4, 2012 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arendi S.A.R.L.. Apple Inc. served on 12/3/2012, answer due 12/26/2012. (Belgam, Neal)
December 3, 2012 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Apple Inc. on 12/3/2012. (dzb, )
November 30, 2012 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Arendi S.A.R.L. identifying Corporate Parent No parent company for Arendi S.A.R.L... (Belgam, Neal)
November 29, 2012 No Summons Issued. (rwc)
November 29, 2012 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (rwc)
November 29, 2012 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1181136.) - filed by Arendi S.A.R.L. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)
November 19, 2012 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,917,843; 7,496,854; 8,306,993. (rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Arendi S.A.R.L. v. Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arendi S.A.R.L.
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Represented By: Dawn Kurtz Crompton
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Harry P. Susman
Represented By: Stephen D. Susman
Represented By: Alexandra White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Christine K. Corbett
Represented By: Mark D. Fowler
Represented By: Kevin C. Hamilton
Represented By: Denise Seastone Kraft
Represented By: Summer Krause
Represented By: Aleine Michelle Porterfield
Represented By: Robert C. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]