CreateAds LLC v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Defendant: Google Inc.
Plaintiff: CreateAds LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01606
Filed: November 29, 2012
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel Hipskind for CreateAds LLC,added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01603-GMS et al.(els)
March 18, 2013 18 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Google Inc. re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Horwitz, Richard)
March 14, 2013 17 REPLY BRIEF re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 26, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (5 in 1:13-cv-00210-GMS, 10 in 1:13-cv-00071-GMS, 9 in 1:13-cv-00116-GMS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01607-GMS, 4 in 1:13-cv-00282-UNA, 4 in 1:13-cv-00222-GMS, 4 in 1:13-cv-00206-GMS, 14 in 1:12-cv-01609-GMS, 5 in 1:13-cv-00209-GMS, 9 in 1:13-cv-00117-GMS, 14 in 1:12-cv-01613-GMS, 5 in 1:13-cv-00207-GMS, 17 in 1:12-cv-01604-GMS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01606-GMS, 8 in 1:13-cv-00112-GMS, 10 in 1:13-cv-00114-GMS, 8 in 1:13-cv-00155-GMS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01675-GMS, 9 in 1:13-cv-00070-GMS, 6 in 1:13-cv-00223-GMS, 14 in 1:12-cv-01612-GMS, 11 in 1:12-cv-01611-GMS, 10 in 1:13-cv-00068-GMS, 4 in 1:13-cv-00211-GMS, 8 in 1:13-cv-00118-GMS, 12 in 1:12-cv-01608-GMS, 4 in 1:13-cv-00212-GMS, 9 in 1:13-cv-00111-GMS, 9 in 1:13-cv-00069-GMS, 9 in 1:13-cv-00119-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel P. Hipskind filed by CreateAds LLC, (4 in 1:13-cv-00119-GMS, 4 in 1:13-cv-00118-GMS, 6 in 1:13-cv-00070-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexander C.D. Giza and Marc A. Fenster filed by CreateAds LLC. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/26/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01610-GMS et al.(asw)
February 25, 2013 16 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CreateAds LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/7/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
February 22, 2013 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel P. Hipskind - filed by CreateAds LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Daniel P. Hipskind)(Brauerman, Stephen)
February 19, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Rochelle L. Woods,Eugene Y. Mar,Stephanie P. Skaff,Andrew P. Nguyen for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 19, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eugene Y. Mar, Stephanie P. Skaff, Andy Nguyen and Rochelle Woods of Farella Braun + Martel LLP filed by Google Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/19/2013. (asw)
February 13, 2013 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eugene Y. Mar, Stephanie P. Skaff, Andy Nguyen and Rochelle Woods of Farella Braun + Martel LLP - filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
February 13, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (12 in 1:12-cv-01613-GMS, 13 in 1:12-cv-01675-GMS, 15 in 1:12-cv-01604-GMS, 12 in 1:12-cv-01606-GMS) Stipulation, filed by CreateAds LLC, Set Briefing Schedule: re(8 in 1:12-cv-01675-GMS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (12 in 1:12-cv-01604-GMS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (7 in 1:12-cv-01606-GMS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (7 in 1:12-cv-01613-GMS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Answering Brief due 2/25/2013., Reply Brief due 3/14/2013.). Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/13/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01604-GMS, 1:12-cv-01606-GMS, 1:12-cv-01613-GMS, 1:12-cv-01675-GMS(asw)
February 8, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexander C. D. Giza,Marc A. Fenster for CreateAds LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01605-GMS, 1:12-cv-01606-GMS, 1:12-cv-01608-GMS, 1:12-cv-01610-GMS(dmp, )
February 8, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexander C.D. Giza and Marc A. Fenster filed by CreateAds LLC. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/8/13. (mmm)
February 7, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER regarding Stipulations to Extend Time to Answer the Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/7/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01603-GMS et al.(asw)
February 7, 2013 12 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re (8 in 1:12-cv-01675-GMS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (12 in 1:12-cv-01604-GMS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (7 in 1:12-cv-01606-GMS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , (7 in 1:12-cv-01613-GMS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by CreateAds LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
February 4, 2013 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by CreateAds LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
January 25, 2013 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
January 25, 2013 9 DECLARATION re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 8 Opening Brief in Support (Declaration of Rochelle L. Woods) by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5)(Moore, David)
January 25, 2013 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/11/2013. (Moore, David)
January 25, 2013 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, David)
January 7, 2013 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexander C.D. Giza and Marc A. Fenster - filed by CreateAds LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Alexander C.D. Giza, # 2 Certification of Marc A. Fenster)(Brauerman, Stephen)
December 11, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 25, 2013 filed by Google Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Google Inc. answer due 1/25/2013. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/11/12. (mmm)
December 10, 2012 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 25, 2013 - filed by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
December 7, 2012 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CreateAds LLC. Google Inc. served on 12/3/2012, answer due 12/26/2012. (Brauerman, Stephen)
December 5, 2012 Cases Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: CA 12-1603 through CA 12-1613.(bkb)
November 30, 2012 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Google Inc. on 11/30/2012. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (dzb, )
November 29, 2012 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,535,320;. (dzb, )
November 29, 2012 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzb, )
November 29, 2012 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Google Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1181570.) - filed by CreateAds LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CreateAds LLC v. Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CreateAds LLC
Represented By: Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes
Represented By: Richard D. Kirk
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]