Bishop v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al

Plaintiff: William E. Bishop
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2013cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Mary Pat Thynge
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and 18 Plaintiff's motion for judicial notice. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), bri efing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2013. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/21/13. (cak)
August 5, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM re 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and 18 Plaintiff's motion for judicial notice (see Memorandum for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2013. (nms)
April 7, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 37 MOTION to Strike Allegations Pled in Amended Complaint and to Dismiss the Amended Complaint with Prejudice, or Alternatively, to Stay the Action Pending the Resolution of a Related State Court Action. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/7/2014. (nms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Bishop
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Gary William Lipkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association
Represented By: Gary William Lipkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]