Technology Innovations Associates LLC v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Technology Innovations Associates LLC
Defendant: Google Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00355
Filed: March 4, 2013
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James C. Pistorino for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
May 17, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James F. Valentine for Google Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
May 13, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Margaret D. Macdonald, James F. Valentine, James C. Pistorino, Nancy Cheng and Wing H. Liang of Perkins Coie, LLP filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/13/13. (ntl)
May 10, 2013 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Margaret D. Macdonald, James F. Valentine, James C. Pistorino, Nancy Cheng and Wing H. Liang of Perkins Coie, LLP - filed by Google Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu)
April 25, 2013 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Google Inc.. (Moore, David)
April 25, 2013 8 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Google Inc..(Moore, David)
March 29, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sarah M. Paxson,Paul V. Storm for Technology Innovations Associates LLC,added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00348-LPS et al.(rbe)
March 27, 2013 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Technology Innovations Associates LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 20, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (5 in 1:13-cv-00348-LPS, 7 in 1:13-cv-00353-LPS, 5 in 1:13-cv-00349-LPS, 5 in 1:13-cv-00356-LPS, 6 in 1:13-cv-00355-LPS, 5 in 1:13-cv-00351-LPS, 6 in 1:13-cv-00350-LPS, 5 in 1:13-cv-00352-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul V. Storm and Sarah M. Paxson filed by Technology Innovations Associates LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/20/13. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00348-LPS et al.(ntl)
March 19, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 25, 2013 filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/19/13. (ntl)
March 19, 2013 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul V. Storm and Sarah M. Paxson - filed by Technology Innovations Associates LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Paul V. Storm, # 2 Certification of Sarah M. Paxson)(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 15, 2013 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 25, 2013 - filed by Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
March 8, 2013 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Technology Innovations Associates LLC. Google Inc. served on 3/5/2013, answer due 3/26/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 6, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00348-LPS through 1:13-cv-00353-LPS; 1:13-cv-00355-LPS, 1:13-cv-00356-LPS (rjb)
March 5, 2013 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Google Inc. on 3/5/2013. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (els)
March 4, 2013 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,840,619; 8,280,932;. (els)
March 4, 2013 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els)
March 4, 2013 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Google Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1242070.) - filed by Technology Innovations Associates LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2, # 3 Exhibit A part 3, # 4 Exhibit B part 1, # 5 Exhibit B part 2, # 6 Exhibit B part 3, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(els)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Technology Innovations Associates LLC v. Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technology Innovations Associates LLC
Represented By: Sarah M. Paxson
Represented By: Richard D. Kirk
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Paul V. Storm
Represented By: Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]