In Re: Linda A. Hawkins and Gregory L. Hawkins

Debtor: Linda A. Hawkins and Gregory L. Hawkins
Appellant: Elva D. Allen
Appellee: Michael B. Joseph
Case Number: 1:2013cv00526
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: Sussex
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/20/13. (mdb)
May 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/3/13. (cak)
May 8, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Withdrawing the Bankruptcy Appeal from Mediation(re: 7 Recommendation.) ; ORDER setting briefing schedule: ( Appellant Brief due by 6/10/2013., Appellee Brief due by 7/10/2013., Appellant Reply Brief due by 7/24/2013.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/8/2013. (nmfn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Linda A. Hawkins and Gregory L. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Linda A. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Gregory L. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Elva D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael B. Joseph
Represented By: Michael B. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.