McGown v. Silverman & Borenstein PLLC et al

Defendant: ADP, Inc. and Silverman & Borenstein PLLC
Plaintiff: Holly McGown
Case Number: 1:2013cv00748
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: Sussex
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Silverman & Borenstein PLLC. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten ( 10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 2/21/2014. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/3/14. (cak)
February 7, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 GRANTING the MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by ADP, Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Obje ctions (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 2/24/2014. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/7/14. (kjk)
February 7, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 DENYING the MOTION for Monetary and Other Sanctions filed by ADP, Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections ( no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 2/24/2014. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/7/14. (kjk)
April 23, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Reports and Recommendations filed at D.I. 29 , 30 , 31 . Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/23/2014. (nms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGown v. Silverman & Borenstein PLLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADP, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverman & Borenstein PLLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly McGown
Represented By: W. Christopher Componovo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]