In re: LCI Holding Company Inc. et al

Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, LCI Holding Company Inc., Steering Committee and Hospital Acquisition LLC
Debtor: LCI Holding Company Inc.
Appellant: United States of America
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00924
Filed: May 23, 2013
 
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/26/13. (cak)
June 28, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Withdrawing the Bankruptcy Appeal from Mediation re 10 Recommendation. ORDER setting briefing schedule: ( Appellant Brief due by 7/29/2013., Appellee Brief due by 8/29/2013., Appellant Reply Brief due by 9/13/2013.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/27/2013. (nmfn)
March 10, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/10/2014. (nmfn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In re: LCI Holding Company Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Laura Davis Jones
Represented By: Bradford J. Sandler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LCI Holding Company Inc.
Represented By: Kristhy Michelle Peguero
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Steering Committee
Represented By: Stanley Byron Tarr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hospital Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Stanley Byron Tarr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: LCI Holding Company Inc.
Represented By: Kristhy Michelle Peguero
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher J. Williamson
Represented By: Ellen W. Slights
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]