Coho Licensing LLC v. Linkedin Corporation Featured Case

Defendant: Linkedin Corporation
Plaintiff: Coho Licensing LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv01569
Filed: September 17, 2013
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2014 Remark: Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in California Northern District as case 4:14-cv-01577, filed 04/04/2014. (rbe)
April 3, 2014 33 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,024,395; 8,166,096. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms)
April 1, 2014 Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. Certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (nms)
March 25, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Cristina Arenas-Solis for Coho Licensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01568-RGA, 1:13-cv-01569-RGA, 1:13-cv-01573-RGA, 1:13-cv-01575-RGA, 1:13-cv-01576-RGA(dmp, )
March 25, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (21 in 1:13-cv-01568-RGA, 33 in 1:13-cv-01576-RGA, 32 in 1:13-cv-01569-RGA, 31 in 1:13-cv-01573-RGA, 32 in 1:13-cv-01575-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cristina Arenas-Solis filed by Coho Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/25/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01568-RGA, 1:13-cv-01569-RGA, 1:13-cv-01573-RGA, 1:13-cv-01575-RGA, 1:13-cv-01576-RGA(nms)
March 24, 2014 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cristina Arenas-Solis - filed by Coho Licensing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Cristina Arenas-Solis)(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 21, 2014 31 Featured Case ORDER Granting 14 Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), filed by Ning Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Twitter Inc., Glam Media Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2014. (nms) Modified on 3/24/2014 (nms).
March 19, 2014 30 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding the Moving Defendants write to bring to the Court's attention a decision of today from Judge Sleet that is relevant to their Motion to Transfer (Segan LLC v. Zynga Inc.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 13, 2014 29 REPLY BRIEF re 14 Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ying, Jennifer) Modified on 3/14/2014 (nms).
March 12, 2014 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of LinkedIn Corp.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Linkedin Corporation.(Ying, Jennifer)
March 12, 2014 27 NOTICEOf Service of (1) Plaintiff Coho Licensing Llcs Mandatory Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and (2) this Notice of Service, filed by Coho Licensing LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) Modified on 3/13/2014 (nms).
March 3, 2014 26 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 14 Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), filed by Coho Licensing LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 3/4/2014 (nms).
February 25, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDER: On or before March 11, 2014, each party or each party group shall email to Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, certain information requested in the Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/25/14. (cak)
February 25, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Judge Thynge for Mediation. (cak)
February 24, 2014 24 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 8/13/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2014. All Discovery due by 5/29/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 11/6/2015. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 4/1/2015. A Markman Hearing is set for 4/22/2015, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Trial Scheduling Conference is set for 12/18/2015, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 3/18/2016, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. The first Jury Trial is set for 3/28/2016, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01568-RGA, 1:13-cv-01569-RGA, 1:13-cv-01573-RGA, 1:13-cv-01575-RGA, 1:13-cv-01576-RGA(nms)
February 22, 2014 23 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Coho Licensing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 2/24/2014 (nms).
February 14, 2014 22 Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 02-12-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2014. (lad)
February 12, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 2/12/2014. Counsel for plaintiff will submit revised order with agreed upon dates. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01568-RGA et al.(ksr, )
February 12, 2014 21 DECLARATION of Fernando Ruarte re (15 in 1:13-cv-01576-RGA) MOTION to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), by Glam Media Inc., Ning Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Twitter Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 2/18/2014 (nms).
February 12, 2014 20 DECLARATION of Ed Axelsen re (15 in 1:13-cv-01576-RGA) MOTION to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), by Glam Media Inc., Ning Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Twitter Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 2/18/2014 (nms).
February 12, 2014 19 DECLARATION of Samson Bekele re (15 in 1:13-cv-01576-RGA) Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), by Glam Media Inc., Ning Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Twitter Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 2/12/2014 (nms).
February 12, 2014 18 DECLARATION of Jay Kreps re (15 in 1:13-cv-01576-RGA) Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), by Glam Media Inc., Ning Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Twitter Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 2/12/2014 (nms).
February 12, 2014 17 DECLARATION of Heather Belville re (15 in 1:13-cv-01576-RGA) Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), by Glam Media Inc., Ning Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Twitter Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-25, # 2 Exhibit 26-42)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 2/12/2014 (nms).
February 12, 2014 16 DECLARATION of Sam Stake re (15 in 1:13-cv-01576-RGA) Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), by Glam Media Inc., Ning Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Twitter Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 2/12/2014 (nms).
February 12, 2014 15 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 14 Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), filed by Linkedin Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 2/12/2014 (nms).
February 12, 2014 14 Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) - filed by Glam Media Inc., Ning Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Twitter Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 2/12/2014 (nms).
February 11, 2014 13 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Coho Licensing LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 2/12/2014 (nms).
February 11, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Motions for Scheduling Order filed on 2/10/2014, have been removed from the docket as these filings were not motions. Counsel shall refile the Proposed Order using the proposed order event code. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01568-RGA et al.(nms)
February 7, 2014 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (12 in 1:13-cv-01569-RGA, 13 in 1:13-cv-01576-RGA, 12 in 1:13-cv-01574-RGA, 12 in 1:13-cv-01575-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin Johnson, Claude Stern, Ray Zado, Heather Belville & Sam Stake filed by Ning Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Salesforce.com Inc., Twitter Inc., Glam Media Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01569-RGA, 1:13-cv-01574-RGA, 1:13-cv-01575-RGA, 1:13-cv-01576-RGA(nms)
February 7, 2014 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin Johnson, Claude Stern, Ray Zado, Heather Belville & Sam Stake - filed by Glam Media Inc., Ning Inc., Salesforce.com Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Twitter Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer)
February 7, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The motion filed at D.I. 12 has been removed from the docket per counsel's request. Counsel will refile the motion. (nms)
January 31, 2014 11 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/12/2014, at 1:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/31/2014. (nms)
December 12, 2013 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Linkedin Corporation identifying Corporate Parent no parent corporation for Linkedin Corporation.. (Ying, Jennifer)
December 12, 2013 9 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Linkedin Corporation.(Ying, Jennifer)
November 18, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (8 in 1:13-cv-01572-RGA, 8 in 1:13-cv-01574-RGA, 9 in 1:13-cv-01576-RGA, 8 in 1:13-cv-01575-RGA, 8 in 1:13-cv-01569-RGA, 8 in 1:13-cv-01568-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to Complaint to December 12, 2013, filed by Ning Inc., Linkedin Corporation, eBay Inc., Twitter Inc., Coho Licensing LLC, AOL Inc., Salesforce.com Inc., Glam Media Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/18/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01568-RGA et al.(nms)
November 15, 2013 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to Complaint to December 12, 2013 - filed by eBay Inc., Glam Media Inc., Ning Inc., Coho Licensing LLC, Salesforce.com Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Twitter Inc., AOL Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
November 13, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (7 in 1:13-cv-01572-RGA, 8 in 1:13-cv-01576-RGA, 7 in 1:13-cv-01569-RGA, 7 in 1:13-cv-01575-RGA, 7 in 1:13-cv-01574-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to Complaint to November 19, 2013, filed by Ning Inc., Linkedin Corporation, eBay Inc., Twitter Inc., Coho Licensing LLC, AOL Inc., Salesforce.com Inc., Glam Media Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/13/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01569-RGA, 1:13-cv-01572-RGA, 1:13-cv-01574-RGA, 1:13-cv-01575-RGA, 1:13-cv-01576-RGA(nms)
November 12, 2013 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to Complaint to November 19, 2013 - filed by Coho Licensing LLC, eBay Inc., Glam Media Inc., Ning Inc., Salesforce.com Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Twitter Inc., AOL Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
October 15, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola for Coho Licensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01568-RGA et al.(dmp, )
October 8, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (6 in 1:13-cv-01576-RGA, 6 in 1:13-cv-01572-RGA, 5 in 1:13-cv-01573-RGA, 5 in 1:13-cv-01568-RGA, 6 in 1:13-cv-01575-RGA, 6 in 1:13-cv-01569-RGA, 6 in 1:13-cv-01574-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola filed by Coho Licensing LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/8/2013. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01568-RGA et al.(nms)
October 7, 2013 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola - filed by Coho Licensing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola)(Brauerman, Stephen)
September 26, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 12, 2013, filed by Linkedin Corporation, Coho Licensing LLC (Reset Answer Deadlines: Linkedin Corporation answer due 11/12/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/26/2013. (nms)
September 26, 2013 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 12, 2013 - filed by Coho Licensing LLC, Linkedin Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 25, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01568-RGA, 1:13-cv-01569-RGA and 1:13-cv-01572-RGA through 1:13-cv-01576-RGA (rjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coho Licensing LLC v. Linkedin Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linkedin Corporation
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coho Licensing LLC
Represented By: Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes
Represented By: Richard D. Kirk
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]