In Re: Fisker Automotive Holdings Inc. et al

Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Appellant: Hybrid Tech Holdings LLC
Debtor: Fisker Automotive Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00099
Filed: January 24, 2014
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Hybrid Tech Holdings LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/7/2014. (asw)
February 12, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 9 Emergency REQUEST for Certification of Direct Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals filed by Hybrid Tech Holdings LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/12/2014. (asw)
February 18, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/18/14. (kjk)
February 19, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 37 Recommendation that BK Appeal be Withrawn from Mediation and the parties are directed to submit a proposed briefing schedule to the court no later than March 7, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/19/14. (mmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Fisker Automotive Holdings Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: William R. Baldiga
Represented By: Sunni P. Beville
Represented By: Shoshana B. Kaiser
Represented By: Mark Minuti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Hybrid Tech Holdings LLC
Represented By: Richard Alan Barkasy
Represented By: Fred William Hoensch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Fisker Automotive Holdings Inc.
Represented By: James E. O'Neill, III
Represented By: Peter James Keane
Represented By: Laura Davis Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]