Ophrys, LLC v. OneMain Financial, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Ophrys, LLC |
Defendant: |
OneMain Financial, Inc., a Delaware corporation, OneMain Financial, Inc., a West Virginia corporation, OneMain Financial, Inc., a Minnesota corporation, OneMain Financial, Inc., a Hawaii corporation and CF Network Issuance Trust 2010-1 |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00260 |
Filed: |
March 13, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Delaware |
Office: |
Wilmington Office |
County: |
New Castle |
Presiding Judge: |
Gregory M. Sleet |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 22, 2020 |
Filing
104
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/22/2020. (nms)
|
October 16, 2018 |
Filing
50
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 41 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by CF Network Issuance Trust 2010-1, OneMain Financial, Inc., a West Virginia corporation, OneMain Financial, Inc., a Delaware corporation, OneMain Financia l, Inc., a Hawaii corporation, OneMain Financial, Inc., a Minnesota corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) page s) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 10/30/2018. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/16/18. (cak)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Ophrys, LLC v. OneMain Financial, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Ophrys, LLC |
Represented By: |
Elizabeth Chaney Hall |
Represented By: |
Spencer Hall |
Represented By: |
Neal J. Levitsky |
Represented By: |
Seth Andrew Niederman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: OneMain Financial, Inc., a Delaware corporation |
Represented By: |
Mark C. Franek |
Represented By: |
Stacey A. Scrivani |
Represented By: |
Joseph E. Wolfson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: OneMain Financial, Inc., a West Virginia corporation |
Represented By: |
Mark C. Franek |
Represented By: |
Stacey A. Scrivani |
Represented By: |
Joseph E. Wolfson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: OneMain Financial, Inc., a Minnesota corporation |
Represented By: |
Mark C. Franek |
Represented By: |
Stacey A. Scrivani |
Represented By: |
Joseph E. Wolfson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: OneMain Financial, Inc., a Hawaii corporation |
Represented By: |
Mark C. Franek |
Represented By: |
Stacey A. Scrivani |
Represented By: |
Joseph E. Wolfson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: CF Network Issuance Trust 2010-1 |
Represented By: |
Mark C. Franek |
Represented By: |
Stacey A. Scrivani |
Represented By: |
Joseph E. Wolfson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?