KING et al v. USA

Plaintiff: SCOTT A. AUSTIN, KEVIN J. HARRIS, JOHN J. HAYS and JEFFREY B. KING
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2007cv00589
Filed: August 2, 2007
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Emily C. Hewitt
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jh4) Modified on 5/16/2008 (mb2).
September 26, 2008 28 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION ( Status Report due by 10/10/2008, Supplemental Exhibit due by 10/10/2008.) granting 25 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3)
October 23, 2008 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 32 Joint Status Report filed by KEVIN J. HARRIS, JOHN J. HAYS, SCOTT A. AUSTIN, JEFFREY B. KING, USA Briefing re: Statute of Limitations due by 10/31/2008; Responsive Briefing re: Statute of Limitations due 11/5/2008; Motion to Add Class Members due by 12/30/2008. Objections to this order, if any, due by 10/27/2008. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (el3)
August 4, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION granting 77 Motion for Leave to Appear and appointing new class counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (kl)
January 19, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KING et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT A. AUSTIN
Represented By: Joseph V. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN J. HARRIS
Represented By: Joseph V. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. HAYS
Represented By: Joseph V. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY B. KING
Represented By: Joseph V. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Bowen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]