JENKINS v. USA

Plaintiff: TIMOTHY L. JENKINS
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00050
Filed: January 24, 2008
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY RESCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order: Preliminary Status Conference set for 9/3/2008 02:00 PM (EDT)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
September 9, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery Completed by 3/30/2009. Joint Status Report due by 4/13/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
January 22, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/29/2009 at 2:00 PM (EST) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
January 26, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/30/2009 at 10:00 AM (EST) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
February 18, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant shall provide to chambers, for en camera review, the transcript, as well as a declaration by an Internal Revenue Service official, explaining its contents. Notice of Compliance due by 3/6/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 16, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: On March 6, 2009, defendant provided to chambers, for en camera review, the transcript, as well as a declaration by an Internal Revenue Service official, explaining its contents. The court has reviewed these documents and has determined that nothing therein is relevant to this case. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
April 15, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery completed by 6/29/2009. Joint Status Report due by 7/13/2009. No further enlargements of these deadlines will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
December 14, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION/ORDER: denying 36 Motion to Compel. Joint Status Report on how this case should proceed, with an appropriate proposed schedule due by 1/8/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
February 22, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/10/2010 at 2:30 PM (EST) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 11, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER: Plaintiff shall file his motion regarding the burden of proof/presumption of correctness by 4/14/2010. Exhibit List due by 5/24/2010. Witness List due by 5/24/2010. Appendix A Filings due by 5/24/2010. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's motion by 5/24/2010. Opposing Exhibit List due by 6/25/2010. Opposing Witness List due by 6/25/2010. Opposing Appendix A Filings due by 6/25/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2010 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Trial set for 8/2/2010 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
June 28, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's counsel shall provide to her client a copy of her 6/24/10, motion for enlargement, as well as this order; and Plaintiff's counsel shall file a notice with the court indicating her compliance in this regard by 7/8/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
June 28, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law. Defendant shall file its pretrial materials by 7/27/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
June 29, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pre-trial Conference set for 8/25/2010 at 10:00 AM (EDT) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Trial set for 9/27/2010 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
July 9, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion for an Order Shifting Burden of Production and Proof. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
July 27, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: A pre-trial conference that was originally scheduled for August 25, 2010, has been rescheduled for August 31, 2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
August 31, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: On or before 9/20/2010, the parties shall file a joint stipulation of undisputed facts. Trial set for 9/27/2010 at 10:00 AM (EDT) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
September 22, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion for an order permitting additional documents. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
September 24, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 69 Motion seeking leave to include two sets of additional documents in his exhibit list. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
October 18, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the parties shall file a joint exhibit containing all the relevant pages of depositions used during trial by 10/25/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
October 25, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER closing proof. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
October 25, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court POST TRIAL ORDER: The proofs shall be closed with the filing of the official transcript and the parties' briefs.Post Trial Brief due 12/14/2010. Replies to initial post-trial brief due 1/14/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
December 10, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time. Post Trial Briefs due 12/21/2010. Post Trial Replies Brief due 1/28/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
January 31, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Closing Argument. Closing Argument set for 3/16/2011 at 10:00 AM (EST) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 1, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCHEDULING 83 CLOSING ARGUMENT.Closing Argument set for 3/17/2011, at 10:00 a.m. (EST) at National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
September 15, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing plaintiff's complaint. No costs. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: JENKINS v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY L. JENKINS
Represented By: Jane C. Bergner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Allison Barbara Ickovic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]