TEXTAINER EQUIPMENT MANGEMENT LIMITED, ET AL. v. USA

Plaintiff: TEXTAINER EQUIPMENT MANGEMENT LIMITED, CAI INTERNATIONAL, INC. and CRONOS CONTAINERS LIMITED
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00610
Filed: September 2, 2008
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Nancy B. Firestone
Referring Judge: John P. Wiese
 
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ALLOWING JOINDER AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER:Plaintiffs' oral motion to join Capital Lease Limited is GRANTED. Close of limited discovery of Capital by 7/17/2013. Status Report due by 7/24/2013. The court STAYS ruling on the parties' supplemental cross-motions, plaintiffs' motion for sanctions, and the proper interest rate pending discovery. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lb) Copy to parties.
July 22, 2013 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 145 Motion to Compel; denying 142 Motion for Protective Order. Stay on discovery now lifted. Limited discovery closes by 8/19/2013. Joint Status Report due by 8/23/2013. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lb) Copy to parties.
April 22, 2014 166 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION granting-in-part and denying-in-part 91 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting-in-part and denying-in-part 97 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Proposed Judgment due by 5/9/2014. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (sr) Copy to parties.
June 30, 2014 176 Opinion or Order of the Court UNREPORTED Order denying 94 Motion for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 37; denying 167 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 168 Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (sr) Copy to parties.
June 17, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 38 , 49 Plaintiffs' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages; granting 58 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages. Joint Status Report due by July 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (ek) Copy to parties.
January 10, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION: Denying plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the complaint (ECF No. 73). Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2012. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lb) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: TEXTAINER EQUIPMENT MANGEMENT LIMITED, ET AL. v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEXTAINER EQUIPMENT MANGEMENT LIMITED
Represented By: Lars H. Liebeler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAI INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Lars H. Liebeler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRONOS CONTAINERS LIMITED
Represented By: Lars H. Liebeler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Patryk Jerry Drescher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]