AMERGEN ENERGY COMPANY, LLC v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: AMERGEN ENERGY COMPANY, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00108
Filed: February 23, 2009
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Lynn J. Bush
Referring Judge: Christine O.C. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report requesting the entry of final judgment in this case and attaching a proposed draft order for the entry of judgment disposing of this matter due by 10/24/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
October 8, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION issued under seal on September 17, 2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
October 11, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 103 Motion to Stay. Immediately upon restoration of appropriations to the DOJ, the parties shall CONFER and, as soon as practicablethereafter, shall FILE a Status Report setting forth an agreed upondeadline for the filing of defendants response to plaintiffs Motion toMaintain Certain Filings Under Seal before the court in this matter. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
October 22, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY, SCHEDULING ORDER. Defendant's Response due by 11/15/2013. Plaintiff's Reply due by 12/6/2013.) Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
November 14, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 108 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 96 MOTION To Maintain Certain Filings Under Seal, Pursuant to Protective Order, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Response due by 11/22/2013. Reply due by 12/13/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
March 13, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION denying 96 Motion to Maintain Certain Filings Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order. The Clerk's Office is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant on Counts I-IV of the complaint, for the reasons stated in the c ourts opinion and order of September 17, 2013. The Clerks Office is directed to ENTER final judgment on Count V of the complaint, pursuant to the parties settlement and AmerGens Tax Matters Partners stipulation regarding Count V. Each party shall b ear its own costs.Unless otherwise directed by the court, the Clerks Office is directed to UNSEAL docket entries 1, 52, 53, 56, 58, 91, 92, and 93 on April 10, 2014. In the event that the parties agree that some exception to the unsealing of the abo ve-listed docket entries is warranted, the parties shall jointly FILE a Notice to that effect on or before April 3, 2014. In addition, on or before April 3, 2014, the parties shall jointly FILE, as separate docket entries, agreed-upon Redacted Versions of any sealed filing(s) that the parties agree should be excepted from the unsealing of the above-listed docket entries. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
April 10, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The government's Response/Reply shall be FILED on or before April 26, 2013, and shall not exceed ninety pages; and Plaintiff's Reply brief shall be FILED on or before May 31, 2013, and shall not exceed forty-five pages. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
September 17, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 97 Motion for Extension of Time to file defendant's response to plaintiff's motion to maintain certain filings under seal. Defendant's Response due by 10/17/2013; Plaintiff's Reply due by 11/15/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: AMERGEN ENERGY COMPANY, LLC v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Cory Arthur Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERGEN ENERGY COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Terri Lynn Mascherin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]