HALL v. USA

Plaintiff: DAWN HALL
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00239
Filed: April 20, 2009
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Bohdan A. Futey
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery completed by 2/7/2011. Dispositive motions due by 3/14/2011. Responses due by 4/11/2011. Replies may be filed by 4/25/2011. Signed by Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (nm)
June 21, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court granting 19 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; PUBLISHED OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1) Copy to parties.
September 10, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION granting 5 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6); denying 8 Motion for Oral Argument; ORDER of Dismissal. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Sr. Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HALL v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN HALL
Represented By: Richard A. Regnier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Speck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]