PEW FOREST PRODUCTS

Plaintiff: PEW FOREST PRODUCTS
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2009cv00814
Filed: November 20, 2009
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order: Preliminary Status Conference set for 5/27/2010 at 2:00 PM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
May 28, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 12/13/2010. Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2010. Parties shall disclose their expert witnesses by 1/10/2011. Parties shall disclose their expert report(s) by 3/7/2011. Depositions of expert witnesses by 5/6/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
November 29, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery completed by 2/11/2011. Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
January 31, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery due by 3/4/2011. Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2011. Parties shall disclose their espert witnesses by 4/1/2011. Parties shall disclose their expert report(s) by 5/27/2011. Depositions of expert witness shall be completed 7/22/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
May 4, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/5/2011 at 3:00 PM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 6, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Brief due by 5/13/2011. Cross Motions due by 6/13/2011. Response due by 6/30/2011. Reply due by 7/18/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 15, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, in part, and denying, in part 32 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant response due by 7/20/2011. Plaintiff reply due by 8/8/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 23, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Oral Argument on Motion. Oral Argument set for 10/27/2011 at 2:00 PM (EST) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 27, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resetting Hearing re: 41 order setting oral argument. Oral Argument set for 12/12/2011 at 2:00 PM (EST) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 7, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION granting 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is hereby ordered to dismiss plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 11, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ERRATA in the opinion filed on May 7, 2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 18, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
January 8, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 6 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Response due by 3/19/2010. No further enlargements of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEW FOREST PRODUCTS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEW FOREST PRODUCTS
Represented By: Robert John Tuerck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Russell James Upton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]